EP1584379 - Process for delaying the printing of an identification code on a postal item [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solystic 14, avenue Raspail 94257 Gentilly Cedex / FR | [2005/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miette, Emmanuel 10, avenue Catinat 95210 Saint-Gratien / FR | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Prugneau, Philippe, et al Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2006/03] |
Former [2005/41] | Prugneau, Philippe, et al Cabinet Prugneau - Schaub, 36, rue des Petits Champs 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05300234.1 | 31.03.2005 | [2005/41] | Priority number, date | FR20040050702 | 07.04.2004 Original published format: FR 0450702 | [2005/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1584379 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1584379 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B07C3/18, B07C3/14 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
B07C3/18 (EP,US);
B07C3/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum zeitlichen Verschieben des Aufdruckens eines Identifizierungscodes auf eine Postsendung | [2005/41] | English: | Process for delaying the printing of an identification code on a postal item | [2005/41] | French: | Procédé pour retarder l'impression d'un code d'identification sur un envoi postal | [2005/41] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 23.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.02.2009 | CY | 18.02.2009 | CZ | 18.02.2009 | DK | 18.02.2009 | EE | 18.02.2009 | IE | 18.02.2009 | LT | 18.02.2009 | PL | 18.02.2009 | RO | 18.02.2009 | SI | 18.02.2009 | SK | 18.02.2009 | TR | 18.02.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | LU | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | BG | 18.05.2009 | SE | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | IS | 18.06.2009 | PT | 27.07.2009 | HU | 19.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
LU | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
HU | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
LU | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9749503 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract *; | [X]DE19705891 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * abstract *; | [X]WO0000300 (CRISPLANT AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract *; | [X]WO0165472 (SIEMENS PRODUCTION & LOGISTICS [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * claim - *; | [A]US2001054031 (LEE RAYMOND [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0242] *; | [A]US2002172399 (POULIN JEFFREY SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0003] ** paragraph [0020] *; | [X]WO03004178 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * |