EP1761069 - Method and apparatus for encoding video data using block skip mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Zhi Bo 8F, Bldg. A, Technology Fortune Center 8 Xue Qin 100085, Beijing / CN | 02 /
Chen, Qu Qing 8F, Bldg. A, Technology Fortune Center 8 Xue Qin 100085, Beijing / CN | 03 /
Zhu, Li Hua 8F, Bldg. A, Technology Fortune Center 8 Xue Qi 100085, Beijing / CN | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2007/10] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 05300709.2 | 01.09.2005 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1761069 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/50, H04N7/26 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
H04N19/18 (EP);
H04N19/122 (EP);
H04N19/126 (EP);
H04N19/132 (EP);
H04N19/14 (EP);
H04N19/176 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/46] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Videodatenkodierung mit Blocküberspringungsmode | [2007/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for encoding video data using block skip mode | [2007/10] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour le codage de données vidéo avec un mode d'omission de blocks | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5719961 (NORMILE JAMES OLIVER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9 [A] 3-6; | [XA]EP1349395 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-9 * abstract * [A] 3-6; | [XA]US2005047504 (SUNG CHIH-TA STAR [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063]; figures 4,10 * [A] 3-6; | [XA] - RSV P ET AL, "EFFICIENT IMPLEMENTATION OF MPEG-4 VIDEO ENCODER ON RISC CORE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200302), vol. 49, no. 1, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 204 - 209, XP001157992 [X] 1,2,7-9 * page 206, paragraph 4.1.2 - page 207 * [A] 3-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCE.2003.1205478 | [A] - EDITOR: T. WIEGAND, "ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 CODING OF MOVING PICTURES AND AUDIO - Text of Committee Draft of Joint Video Specification (ITU-T Rec. H.264 ISO/IEC 14496-10 AVC) JVT-C167", ISO - INTERNATIONAL ORGANISATION FOR STANDARDISATION, Fairfax, VA, USA, (200205), page 5, XP002365203 [A] 1-9 * page 5, paragraph 3.107 * | by applicant | EP1727370 |