EP1768323 - Method and apparats for feature sharing between mobile devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peuziat, Xavier HP CCF 5 av. Raymond Chanas 38053, Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
Clauzel, Gilbert HP Centre de Competences France 5 av. Raymond Chan 38053, Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | 03 /
Guyot, Galina HP Centre de Competences France 5 av. Raymond Chan 38053, Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Franks, Adam Peter Hewlett-Packard Espanola, SL Legal Department Cami de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Vallés Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Franks, Adam Peter HP Centre de Compétences IP Section, 5, Av. Raymond Chanas F-38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05300780.3 | 27.09.2005 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1768323 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04M1/725 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
H04W88/04 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04W4/00 (EP);
H04W4/12 (EP);
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FI, GB, SE [2007/49] |
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Merkmalsmitbenutzung zwischen mobilen Endgeräten | [2007/13] | English: | Method and apparats for feature sharing between mobile devices | [2007/13] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour permettre le partage de charactéristiques communes entre dispositifs mobiles | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 29.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 05.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 15.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - BLUETOOTH SIG, "Specification of the Bluetooth Sytem, Part E, Service Discovery Protocol (SDP)", BLUETOOTH SPECIFICATIONS, (19991201), pages 325 - 384, XP002245657 [X] 1-12 * pages 327-335 * * pages 337-338 * * page 370 * | Examination | - DIPANJAN CHAKRABORTY ET AL, "Service discovery in the future for mobile commerce", CROSSROADS, (20001201), vol. 7, no. 2, doi:10.1145/355146.355151, ISSN 1528-4972, pages 18 - 24, XP055038776 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/355146.355151 | - GRYAZIN E A, "Service Discovery in Bluetooth", INTERNET CITATION, (20011109), URL: http://citeseer.ist.psu.edu/392311.html, (20041222), XP002311799 | - HODES T D ET AL, "COMPOSABLE AD HOC LOCATION-BASED SERVICES FOR HETEROGENEOUS MOBILE CLIENTS", WIRELESS NETWORKS, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 - NEW YORK USA, (19991001), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1023/A:1019171616176, ISSN 1022-0038, pages 411 - 427, XP000902495 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1019171616176 |