EP1561708 - Demountable modular platform for a refuse dump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, TR | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Modulo Beton 70, avenue du Danemark 82000 Montauban / FR | [2005/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pegot-Ogier, Jean-Jacques 3570, route de Lamothe 82 000 Montauban / FR | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou S.C. 9 Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou S.C. 9 Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/32] | Morelle, Guy Cabinet Morelle & Bardou, SC, BP 72253 31522 Ramonville Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05352003.7 | 31.01.2005 | [2005/32] | Priority number, date | FR20040001037 | 04.02.2004 Original published format: FR 0401037 | [2005/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561708 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561708 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/00 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
B65F1/0033 (EP);
Y02W30/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/32] | Title | German: | Demontierbare, modulare Bühne einer Müllsammeleinrichtung | [2005/32] | English: | Demountable modular platform for a refuse dump | [2005/32] | French: | Plate-forme modulaire démontable pour déchetterie | [2005/32] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 30.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2006 | CY | 29.11.2006 | CZ | 29.11.2006 | EE | 29.11.2006 | FI | 29.11.2006 | IE | 29.11.2006 | LT | 29.11.2006 | NL | 29.11.2006 | PL | 29.11.2006 | RO | 29.11.2006 | SI | 29.11.2006 | SK | 29.11.2006 | TR | 29.11.2006 | MC | 31.01.2007 | BG | 28.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | SE | 28.02.2007 | GR | 01.03.2007 | IS | 29.03.2007 | HU | 30.05.2007 | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/10] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
EE | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
LT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
IS | 29.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
LT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
IS | 29.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/52] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
LT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
IS | 29.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
LT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
IS | 29.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
LT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
IS | 29.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | IS | 29.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2195676 (NEWELL DUNFORD LIMITED) [A] 1,7,11,12,18 * page 1, line 116 - page 2, line 66 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2687939 (EST SARL FINANCIERE MECANIQUE [FR]) [A] 1,7,11,12,18,19 * page 4, line 16 - page 6, line 17 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2689916 (JOBARD DANIEL [FR]) [A] 1,7,11,12,18 * page 4, line 5 - page 6, line 13 * * figures 1-4 *; | [DA]FR2706791 (GESTA SARL [FR], et al) [DA] 1* abstract * |