EP1566124 - Closure lid of a container of a household appliance for preparing food of the blender type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, LU, TR | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M, Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | ||
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M, Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ravard, Franck 28, Rue Guyard de la Fosse 53100 Mayenne / FR | 02 /
Grassin, Stéphane 82, Avenue Victor Hugo 72130 Fresnay Sur Sarthe / FR | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Kiehl, Hubert, et al SEB Développement Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Kiehl, Hubert, et al SEB Développement, Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois, B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05356028.0 | 08.02.2005 | [2005/34] | Priority number, date | FR20040001712 | 20.02.2004 Original published format: FR 0401712 | [2005/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1566124 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1566124 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/21 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
A47J27/21175 (EP);
A47J43/046 (EP);
A47J43/0716 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Title | German: | Verschlussdeckel für ein Behältnis von einem Haushaltsgerät zur Nahrungszubereitung, insbesondere einem Mixer | [2005/34] | English: | Closure lid of a container of a household appliance for preparing food of the blender type | [2005/34] | French: | Couvercle de fermeture d'un récipient d'appareil électroménager de préparation culinaire de type blender | [2005/34] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 22.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2006 | CY | 21.06.2006 | CZ | 21.06.2006 | EE | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | GB | 21.06.2006 | IE | 21.06.2006 | LT | 21.06.2006 | NL | 21.06.2006 | PL | 21.06.2006 | RO | 21.06.2006 | SI | 21.06.2006 | SK | 21.06.2006 | TR | 21.06.2006 | BG | 21.09.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | SE | 21.09.2006 | DE | 22.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | HU | 22.12.2006 | LU | 08.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | IS | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/32] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
LT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
IS | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/05] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/52] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
LT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 21.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5275307 (FREESE ROSS J [US]) [DA] 1* column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 60; figure - *; | [A]US5294014 (WYATT W BURK [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 2, line 23 - column 5, line 11; figure - *; | [A]FR2696087 (SEB SA [FR]) [A] 1,3,6-8 * page 3, line 28 - page 7, line 33; figures -1 *; | [A]WO0132063 (SEB SA [FR]) [A] 1-5,7,8 * page 5, line 34 - page 10, line 3; figure - * |