EP1570968 - Breathing aid apparatus with expansion chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/52] |
Former [2014/28] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Kaerys S.A. 50, Boulevard Stalingrad 06300 Nice / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delache, Alain 15 Avenue de la Roseraie 06300 Nice / FR | 02 /
Castelo, Véronique 15 Avenue de la Roseraie 06300 Nice / FR | 03 /
Parent, Benoît 220 Chemin des Oliviers - Quartier Meaynes - 06550 La Roquette sur Siagne / FR | [2015/52] |
Former [2005/46] | 01 /
Delache, Alain 15 Avenue de la Roseraie 06300 Nice / FR | ||
02 /
Castelo, Véronique 15 Avenue de la Roseraie 06300 Nice / FR | |||
03 /
Parent, Benoît 220 Chemin des Oliviers - Quartier Meaynes - 06550 La Roquette sur Siagne / FR | |||
Former [2005/36] | 01 /
Declache, Alain 15 Avenue de la Roseraie 06300 Nice / FR | ||
02 /
Castelo, Véronique 15 Avenue de la Roseraie 06300 Nice / FR | |||
03 /
Parent, Benoît 220 Chemin des Oliviers - Quartier Meaynes - 06550 La Roquette sur Siagne / FR | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle, et al Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2014/28] | Verweij, Petronella Danielle, et al Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/01] | Damen, Daniel Martijn Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/36] | de Zeeuw, Johan Diederick Murgitroyd & Company, Immeuble Atlantis 55, Allée Pierre Ziller, Sophia Antipolis 06560 Valbonne / FR | Application number, filing date | 05368007.0 | 28.02.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | FR20040002093 | 01.03.2004 Original published format: FR 0402093 | [2005/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1570968 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1570968 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00, B29C41/14, B29C41/42, // B29K9/06, B29K21/00, B29K83/00, B29K75/00 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
A61M16/0057 (EP);
A61M16/0078 (EP);
B29C41/14 (EP);
B29C41/42 (EP);
A61M16/0063 (EP);
A61M16/0066 (EP);
A61M2205/42 (EP);
A61M2206/14 (EP);
B29K2009/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/36] | B29C41/14, B29C41/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beatmungsgerät mit Expansionskammer | [2005/36] | English: | Breathing aid apparatus with expansion chamber | [2005/36] | French: | Appareil d'assistance respiratoire comprenant une chambre d'expansion | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 16.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2011 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 04.11.2011 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 01.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Request for further processing for: | 26.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2005 | AT | 23.12.2015 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | DK | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | ES | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | IT | 23.12.2015 | LT | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | NL | 23.12.2015 | PL | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | SE | 23.12.2015 | SI | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | TR | 23.12.2015 | IE | 28.02.2016 | LU | 28.02.2016 | BE | 29.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | GB | 23.03.2016 | GR | 24.03.2016 | IS | 23.04.2016 | PT | 26.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 28.02.2005 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
GB | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.02.2005 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
GB | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
GB | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
GB | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 23.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9922793 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 21; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5590234 (PULIDO JACQUELINE J [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column 6, line 5 - line 31 * * column 7, line 34 - column 8, line 16; figure 10 *; | [A]US5647354 (LAKHANI MUKUND [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 33 - line 37 * * column 3, line 1 - line 4 * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 28; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9922794 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,3,4,6,7 * page 6, line 4 - page 10, line 25; figures 1-11 *; | [A]DE10205303 (TRUMA GERAETETECHNIK GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033]; figure 1 *; | [A]US6644311 (TRUITT PATRICK W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 8 - column 8, line 12; figures 3-5 *; | [A]FR2663547 (TAEMA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 22 - page 4, line 4; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US6315526 | WO9922793 |