EP1740015 - Sound and public address system with decentralised amplification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanchez Perez, Antonio P[deg]. Maria Agustin, 4-6 casa 2 piso 16 50004 Zaragoza / ES | [2007/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Esteban Perez-Serrano, Maria Isabel, et al UDAPI & Asociados Explanada 8 28040 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Esteban Perez-Serrano, Maria Isabel, et al UDAPI & ASOCIADOS Explanada, 8 28040 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05381032.1 | 30.06.2005 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1740015 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04R27/00 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
H04R27/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/36] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beschallungsanlage mit dezentralisierter Verstärkung | [2007/01] | English: | Sound and public address system with decentralised amplification | [2007/01] | French: | Système de sonorisation et d'adresse publique avec amplification décentralisée | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/11] | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0716403 (NIPPON SIGNAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 58 *; | [Y]US2004220687 (KLOTZ THOMAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * figure 1 * * page 1, paragraph 8 * * page 1, paragraph 12 * * page 2, paragraph 28 * * page 2, paragraph 29 * * page 2, paragraph 35 - page 3 *; | [A]GB1302534 (SAAD ZAGHLOUL MOHAMED GABR) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 * * page 1, line 59 - line 70 * * page 2, line 48 - line 62 * * page 2, line 92 - line 103 *; | [A]US4186437 (CUK SLOBODAN M [US]) [A] 2-4 * figures 3-5 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 30 *; | [A]US4037222 (SOLOMON ELIAS E) [A] 6-9 * figures 1-4 * * column 1, line 5 - line 24 * * column 1, line 48 - line 66 *; | [A]GB2199466 (G L COMMUNICATIONS LIMITED) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 1 - line 12 * * page 3, line 1 - line 22 * * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 17 *; | [A]US2003063755 (NOURSE JAMES D [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,3 * * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 1, paragraph 9 * * page 2, paragraph 23 * * page 4, paragraph 41 * * page 4, paragraph 45 * |