EP1713155 - Power supply arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DET International Holding Limited Scotia Center, 4th Floor George Town Grand Cayman / KY | [2006/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glauser, Hans-Peter Chroskerweg 10 3177 Laupen / CH | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Roshardt, Werner Alfred Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Roshardt, Werner Alfred Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Schmiedenplatz 5 Postfach 3000 Bern 7 / CH | ||
Former [2006/42] | Roshardt, Werner Alfred Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Schmiedenplatz 5 Postfach 3000 Bern 7 / CH | Application number, filing date | 05405288.1 | 12.04.2005 | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1713155 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1713155 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02J9/06, H02M7/493, H02J9/00 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
H02M7/493 (EP,US);
H02J9/062 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/42] | H02J9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Title | German: | Stromversorgungsanordnung | [2006/42] | English: | Power supply arrangement | [2006/42] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.04.2005 | AT | 17.10.2012 | BE | 17.10.2012 | CY | 17.10.2012 | CZ | 17.10.2012 | DK | 17.10.2012 | EE | 17.10.2012 | FI | 17.10.2012 | LT | 17.10.2012 | MC | 17.10.2012 | NL | 17.10.2012 | PL | 17.10.2012 | RO | 17.10.2012 | SI | 17.10.2012 | SK | 17.10.2012 | TR | 17.10.2012 | BG | 17.01.2013 | GR | 18.01.2013 | ES | 28.01.2013 | IS | 17.02.2013 | PT | 18.02.2013 | IE | 12.04.2013 | LU | 12.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
TR | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 17.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5237208 (TOMINAGA FUKUTOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5745356 (TASSITINO JR FREDERICK [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 8, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2002153779 (WADE JOSEPH R [US], et al) [A] 3* paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0039]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2003227785 (JOHNSON ROBERT W [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2005012395 (ECKROAD STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 1b *; | [A]US2005036253 (TIAN SHOU-LONG [CN], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-4 * |