EP1717380 - Connection device for connecting a sanitary article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBERIT TECHNIK AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfister, Sascha Schleifetobelweg 3 8810 Horgen / CH | 02 /
Grob, Stefan Aubrigstrasse 31 8645 Jona / CH | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2006/44] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 05405321.0 | 28.04.2005 | [2006/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1717380 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717380 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/122, E03D11/13, F16L43/00 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
F16L43/006 (EP,US);
E03C1/122 (EP);
E03D11/13 (EP);
F16L27/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Title | German: | Anschlussvorrichtung zum Anschliessen eines Sanitärartikels | [2006/44] | English: | Connection device for connecting a sanitary article | [2006/44] | French: | Pièce de raccordement pour brancher un article sanitaire | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.03.2009 | CZ | 18.03.2009 | DK | 18.03.2009 | EE | 18.03.2009 | FI | 18.03.2009 | IE | 18.03.2009 | LT | 18.03.2009 | PL | 18.03.2009 | RO | 18.03.2009 | SI | 18.03.2009 | SK | 18.03.2009 | TR | 18.03.2009 | IT | 28.04.2009 | LU | 28.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | BG | 18.06.2009 | SE | 18.06.2009 | GR | 19.06.2009 | ES | 29.06.2009 | IS | 18.07.2009 | PT | 26.08.2009 | HU | 19.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IT | 28.04.2009 | ||
LU | 28.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
HU | 19.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IT | 28.04.2009 | ||
LU | 28.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IT | 28.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | EE | 18.03.2009 | |
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | FI | 18.03.2009 | |
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | FI | 18.03.2009 | |
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR500622 (J B CORRIE & C [GB]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11 * page 1, line 41 - page 2, line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]FR1083256 (OREGGIA, M. MARCEL) [A] 1,5,8,9,11* the whole document *; | [A]FR2608726 (WAHL MICHEL [DE]) [A] 1,3-8,11 * the whole document *; | [DX]DE20218825U (MEPA PAULI UND MENDEN GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-9 * page 8, line 21 - line 31; figure 7 * | Examination | DE29903954U | by applicant | EP0581734 | DE20218825U |