EP1574762 - Valve device with washing means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zanchetta S.r.l Via della Contea no. 24 Fraz. San Salvatore 55015 Montecarlo (LU) / IT | [2009/07] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Vima Impianti S.r.l. Via Luigi Boccherini, 338 55016 Porcari (Lucca) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nanni, Patrizia Via S. Gennaro, 68 Fraz. Lappato 55010 Capannori (Lucca) / IT | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 05425110.3 | 28.02.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | IT2004BO00124 | 01.03.2004 Original published format: IT BO20040124 | [2005/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1574762 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1574762 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | [2006/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574762 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/22, F16K1/44, B08B9/00, B65D90/62, B65D90/64 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
B65D90/64 (EP,US);
B08B9/00 (EP);
B65D90/623 (EP,US);
B65D2590/547 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0419 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0424 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | Ventilvorrichtung mit Wascheinrichtungen | [2009/22] | English: | Valve device with washing means | [2005/37] | French: | Dispositif de soupapes avec moyens de lavage | [2005/37] |
Former [2005/37] | Ventilvorrichtung mit Waschanordnung | Examination procedure | 27.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.06.2009 | BE | 03.06.2009 | CY | 03.06.2009 | CZ | 03.06.2009 | DK | 03.06.2009 | EE | 03.06.2009 | FI | 03.06.2009 | LT | 03.06.2009 | NL | 03.06.2009 | PL | 03.06.2009 | RO | 03.06.2009 | SI | 03.06.2009 | SK | 03.06.2009 | TR | 03.06.2009 | BG | 03.09.2009 | SE | 03.09.2009 | GR | 04.09.2009 | IS | 03.10.2009 | PT | 03.10.2009 | HU | 04.12.2009 | CH | 28.02.2010 | IE | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | LU | 28.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CY | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
HU | 04.12.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
IE | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
LU | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CY | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
HU | 04.12.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
IE | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CY | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
IE | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
IE | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | LT | 03.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2064730 (SCHLEICHER LEONHARD) [A] 1,11,12,14,15,17-22 * page 2, line 48 - line 111; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4846225 (SCOBIE WILLIAM B [US], et al) [Y] 1-9,11,13-15,17,19,21,22,26-32 * column 3, line 4 - line 62 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4846212 (SCOBIE WILLIAM B [US], et al) [A] 1,11,14,15,17,19,21,22 * column 3, line 4 - line 57; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE19617857 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9,11,13-15,17,19,21,22,26-32 * column 1, line 3 - line 13 * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 22; figures 1,4 *; | [A]DE10024950 (ZEITLER FRANK [DE]) [A] 1,3-9* column 2, line 25 - column 5, line 13; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US4846225 |