EP1600721 - A cooling plant and corresponding thermoconvector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frigel Firenze S.p.a. Via Barontini 17/B Granatieri 50018 Scandicci FI / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Frigel Firenze S.p.a. Via Barontini 17/B Granatieri 50018 Scandicci FI / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dorin, Filipo Via del Lorentino 20 50135 Firenze / IT | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci S.r.l. Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci S.R.L, Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 05425367.9 | 25.05.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | IT2004FI00120 | 28.05.2004 Original published format: IT fi20040120 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1600721 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1600721 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F28F19/00, F28B9/00, F28F17/00 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
F28F19/006 (EP,US);
F28B9/005 (EP,US);
F28F17/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/31] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühlungsvorrichtung und entsprechende Thermokonvektoren | [2005/48] | English: | A cooling plant and corresponding thermoconvector | [2005/48] | French: | Installation de refroidissement et thermoconvecteurs associés | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/47] | 02.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2858111 (AINSWORTH ERNEST R, et al) [X] 5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2891773 (LASZLO HELLER) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [YA]GB1196461 (GKN BIRWELCO LTD) [Y] 8 [A] 1-7; | [X]US4202405 (BERG WILLIAM F [US]) [X] 5,7 * abstract *; | [A]EP0595106 (STRAESSER KARL [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE4239455 (GUENTNER GMBH HANS [DE]) [X] 5-7 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,8; | [A]DE19613910 (CABERO TINO [DE]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [XY]GB2365963 (BRUNO BERNARDI [IT]) [X] 1 * abstract * * pages 4,5; figure -; claims 3,4 * [Y] 2-4 |