EP1731780 - Coupling system between an output shaft of a reduction gear and an input shaft of a user device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecnoingranaggi Riduttori S.r.l. Via Davia 5 40017 S. Giovanni in Persiceto (Bologna) / IT | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cognigni, Enzo Via Francesco Barbieri, 51/2 40129 Bologna / IT | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Cerbaro, Elena STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05425417.2 | 09.06.2005 | [2006/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1731780 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16D1/09 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
F16D1/05 (EP);
F16D1/094 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Title | German: | Kupplungssystem zwischen einer Ausgangswelle eines Untersetzungsgetriebes und einer Eingangswelle einer Anwendervorrichtung | [2006/50] | English: | Coupling system between an output shaft of a reduction gear and an input shaft of a user device | [2006/50] | French: | System d'accouplement d'un arbre de sortie d'un engrenage réducteur et d'un arbre d'entré d'un dispositif utilisateur | [2006/50] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5203221 (LOGSDON MICHAEL A [US]) [X] 1-3 * figure - *; | [X]US5667333 (PHILLIPS ALLYN E [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 6, line 4 - line 17; figure - *; | [X]US5765961 (PHILLIPS ALLYN E [US]) [X] 1-4 * figure - *; | [X]DE29917849U (STOEBER ANTRIEBSTECH GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-4* figure 1 * |