EP1760514 - Scanning device for an optical code reader [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DATALOGIC S.P.A. Via Candini 2 40012 Lippo di Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ciabattoni, Stefano Via Salvatore Allende 1 40064 Ozzano dell'Emilia (Bologna) / IT | 02 /
Comte, Vincent Chemin du Liaudoz 73 1009 Pully / CH | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/10] | 01 /
Ciabattoni, Stefano Via Mirtilli 4 40137 Bologna / IT | ||
02 /
Comte, Vincent Chemin du Liaudoz 73 1009 Pully / CH | Representative(s) | Bottero, Claudio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Bottero, Claudio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05425621.9 | 05.09.2005 | [2007/10] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1760514 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/12, G06K7/10, H02K11/00 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
G06K7/10613 (EP,US);
G02B26/121 (EP,US);
H02K1/146 (EP,US);
H02K11/33 (EP,US);
H02K21/24 (EP,US);
H02K7/14 (EP,US);
H02K2211/03 (EP,US);
H02K7/086 (EP,US);
H05K1/0271 (EP,US);
H05K1/182 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Title | German: | Abtastgerät für einen optischen Code-Leser | [2007/10] | English: | Scanning device for an optical code reader | [2007/10] | French: | Dispositif de balayage pour lecteur optique de codes | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 14.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/14] | 19.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 24.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005237066 ; | [A]JPS6198145 ; | [A]US4836631 (SHIMAZU KIKUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 59; figure 8 *; | [X]US4866324 (YUZAWA SUEZO [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * figure 2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20051205), vol. 2005, no. 12, & JP2005237066 A 20050902 (CANON ELECTRONICS INC) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860920), vol. 010, no. 279, Database accession no. (E - 439), & JP61098145 A 19860516 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |