EP1769939 - Device for the realisation of book or note-book shaped file-holders capable of allowing the insertion and extraction of paper sheets or booklets and/or documents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greenwitch S.r.L. Via Di Vittorio 70 20026 Novate Milanese (MI) / IT | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petillo, Aldo Via Cesare Correnti 14 20100 Milano (MI) / IT | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Arena, Giovanni Viale Certosa 135 20151 Milano / IT | [2007/14] | Application number, filing date | 05425679.7 | 29.09.2005 | [2007/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1769939 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B42F11/00, B42F11/02 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
B42F11/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von einem buch- oder notizbuchgeformten Ordner, geeignet zum Einlegen und Entfernen von Papierbögen oder Heftchen und/oder Dokumenten | [2007/14] | English: | Device for the realisation of book or note-book shaped file-holders capable of allowing the insertion and extraction of paper sheets or booklets and/or documents | [2007/14] | French: | Dispositif pour la réalisation d'un classeur en forme de livre ou d'agenda permettant l'insertion et l'extraction de feuilles ou livrets et/ou de documents | [2007/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/41] | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1190056 (PURSER WILLIAM FRANK [GB]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 5, line 17 - page 12, line 2; figure - *; | [X]FR2064616 (PREVEL MAURICE) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 12; figure - *; | [X]DE8812897U (HERLITZ AG, 1000 BERLIN, DE) [X] 1,3* page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 2; figure - * |