EP1777772 - Apparatus for the storage of electrical energy, used for the supply of priority electrical loads, particularly for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [2007/32] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states CRF Societa'Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casellato, Giancarlo Corso Torino 50 10043 Orbassano Torino / IT | 02 /
Cavalla, Giancarlo Corso Torino 50 10043 Orbassano Torino / IT | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05425734.0 | 19.10.2005 | [2007/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777772 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1777772 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/46, H01M10/48, B60R16/02, H02J7/00 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
H01M10/46 (EP,US);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
B60R16/03 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Speichern von elektrischer Energie für die Versorgung von elektrischen Lasten mit hoher Priorität, insbesondere für Motorfahrzeuge | [2007/17] | English: | Apparatus for the storage of electrical energy, used for the supply of priority electrical loads, particularly for motor vehicles | [2007/17] | French: | Dispositif pour le stockage de l'énergie électrique, pour l'alimentation des charges électriques de haute priorité, de préférence pour des véhicules motorisés | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2006 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 05.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2007 | BE | 07.11.2007 | CH | 07.11.2007 | CY | 07.11.2007 | CZ | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | EE | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | LI | 07.11.2007 | LT | 07.11.2007 | LV | 07.11.2007 | NL | 07.11.2007 | PL | 07.11.2007 | RO | 07.11.2007 | SI | 07.11.2007 | SK | 07.11.2007 | TR | 07.11.2007 | BG | 07.02.2008 | SE | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | ES | 18.02.2008 | IS | 07.03.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | HU | 08.05.2008 | [2010/39] |
Former [2009/45] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5717310 (SAKAI KOUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]US5739668 (NISHIKIORI HIDETAKA [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 42 * * column 3, line 22 - line 24 *; | [A]US5783872 (BLAIR JAMES W [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 30 * |