EP1792561 - Self-propelled endoscopic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Era Endoscopy S.r.l. Via Boccioni 1 56037 Peccioli (Pisa) / IT | [2014/18] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states Era Endoscopy S.r.l. Via G. Leopardi, 6 56025 Pontedera (Pisa) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arena, Alberto Via Paolo Savi, 54 56021 Marciana di Cascina (Pisa) / IT | 02 /
Dario, Paolo Via Cimabue, 3 57100 Livorno / IT | 03 /
Gorini, Samuele Via Pietrone, 1 56020 Montecalvoli (Pisa) / IT | 04 /
Menciassi, Arianna Via Leopardi, 6 56020 Pontedera (Pisa) / IT | 05 /
Pernorio, Giuseppe Via Liguria, 9 56100 Pisa / IT | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Brazzini, Silvia, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Corso dei Tintori, 25 50122 Firenze / IT | [2012/32] |
Former [2007/23] | Bardini, Marco Luigi, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Corso dei Tintori, 25 50122 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 05425854.6 | 30.11.2005 | [2007/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1792561 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1792561 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/31, A61M25/01 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
A61B1/00156 (EP,US);
A61B1/012 (KR);
A61B1/00 (KR);
A61B1/00094 (EP,US);
A61B1/31 (EP,US);
A61M25/0116 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/23] | A61B1/31, A61M25/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Title | German: | Selbstfahrende endoskopische Vorrichtung | [2007/23] | English: | Self-propelled endoscopic device | [2007/23] | French: | Dispositif d'endoscope automoteur | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2013 | 03.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2005 | CY | 11.06.2014 | CZ | 11.06.2014 | EE | 11.06.2014 | FI | 11.06.2014 | LT | 11.06.2014 | LV | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | PL | 11.06.2014 | RO | 11.06.2014 | SI | 11.06.2014 | SK | 11.06.2014 | IS | 11.10.2014 | LU | 30.11.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/31] | CY | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 11.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5398670 (ORTIZ MARK S [US], et al) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [XY]US5662587 (GRUNDFEST WARREN SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 7, line 55 * * column 11, line 9 - line 11 * * column 11, line 45 - line 61 * * column 14, line 14 - line 65; figures 1-80 * [Y] 2-4,7; | [DY]WO02068035 (KIST KOREAN INST OF SCIENCE AN [KR], et al) [DY] 2,3 * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 20; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]WO03053505 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0058] , [0074]; figures 1-23 *; | [YA]US2005070949 (BAKOS GREGORY J [US], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0022] , [0025]; figures 1-8 * [A] 8; | [A]WO2005094665 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]) [A] 6 * page 12, line 33 - page 13, line 2 * * page 13, line 5 - line 9; figures 1-48 * | Examination | EP0838200 | by applicant | US5662587 |