EP1795063 - A rotating square sectioned shaft assembled with squares supporting knives for bushes cutting and land deforestation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bighinati, Claudio Via Dino Compagni 8 21052 Busto Arsizio VA / IT | For all designated states Ferraro, Lino Via Francesco Baracca 22 21052 Busto Arsizio VA / IT | For all designated states Brignoli, Antonio Benedetto Via Contardo Ferrini 51 21052 Busto Arsizio VA / IT | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Tranquillo, Daria, et al Studio Legale MT Via 1. Maggio 8 I-21052 Busto Arsizio (VA) / IT | [2007/24] | Application number, filing date | 05425860.3 | 01.12.2005 | [2007/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1795063 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/73 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
A01D34/535 (EP);
A01G23/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/08] |
Former [2007/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Eine drehende Welle mit viereckigem Querschnitt, in der Quadrate montiert werden, die Messer zum Schneiden von Büschen und Landentwaldung halten | [2007/24] | English: | A rotating square sectioned shaft assembled with squares supporting knives for bushes cutting and land deforestation | [2007/24] | French: | Un arbre roulant avec section carrée, où supports carrés sont montés qui portent des couteaux pour couper les buissons et déboiser les terrains | [2007/24] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/29] | 29.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2877619 (BENSON DON O, et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 71; figures 1,2,6 *; | [X]US3678668 (MOTT CARL W) [X] 1-3,5-8 * column 1, line 56 - column 3, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US3698168 (MOTT CARL W) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 59 - column 3, line 31; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4267690 (PIKE CARL A, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 46 - column 2, line 45; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO0032025 (KANEMARU YUTAKA [JP]) [A] 1* abstract * |