EP1623781 - Gold nanoparticles and method of synthesizing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Standards and Science 1, Doryoung-dong, Yuseong-ku Daejeon Metropolitan-city / KR | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ah, Chil Seong 2-1204, Woosung Apt. Daerim 3-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Yun, Wan Soo 107-807, Nuri Apt. Seo-ku Daejeon Metropolitan-City / KR | 03 /
Yun, Yong Ju, 120 Korea Research Inst. of Stds and Science Dormitory, 1 Doryoung-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon Metropolitan-City / KR | 04 /
Ha, Dong Han, 105-1005, Cheonggunarae Apt. Jeonmin dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon Metropolitan-City / KR | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 05447158.6 | 30.06.2005 | [2006/06] | Priority number, date | KR20040058414 | 26.07.2004 Original published format: KR 2004058414 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1623781 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1623781 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1623781 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B22F9/24, B22F1/00 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
B22F9/24 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/054 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/0551 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/056 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/068 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F1/068 (KR,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Title | German: | Gold Nanopartikel und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2009/01] | English: | Gold nanoparticles and method of synthesizing the same | [2006/06] | French: | Particules d'or nano et leur procédé de synthèse | [2006/06] |
Former [2006/06] | Gold Nanopartikeln und Verfahren zur Herstellung | Examination procedure | 01.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 06.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.2009 | BE | 26.08.2009 | CY | 26.08.2009 | CZ | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | IT | 26.08.2009 | LT | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | PL | 26.08.2009 | RO | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | SI | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | ES | 07.12.2009 | IS | 26.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | HU | 27.02.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | CN1482622 [ ] (UNIV WUHAN [CN]); | CN1155448C [ ] (UNIV NANJING [CN]); | [XY] - LIU FU-KEN ET AL, "Microwave heating for the preparation of nanometer gold particles", JPN J APPL PHYS PART 1 REGUL PAP SHORT NOTE REV PAP; JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 1: REGULAR PAPERS AND SHORT NOTES AND REVIEW PAPERS JUNE 2003, (200306), vol. 42, no. 6 B, pages 4152 - 4158, XP002351502 [X] 1-6,10,11 * page 4153 (section 3.1) * [Y] 7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.42.4152 | [X] - TSUJI MASAHARU ET AL, "Synthesis of gold nanorods and nanowires by a microwave-polyol method", MATER LETT; MATERIALS LETTERS JUL 1 2004, (20040701), vol. 58, no. 17-18, pages 2326 - 2330, XP004510609 [X] 1-3 * page 2327 (3. Results and discussion); abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-577X(04)00156-9 | [XY] - EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, (20001115) [X] 1 * abstract of corresponding CN1273154A *; column A * [Y] 7-9 | [X] - EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, (20040317) [X] 1 * column A * |