EP1655193 - Cable gripper for coupling a cabin or a chair to the hauling/traction cable of a cableway installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innova Patent GmbH Rickenbacherstrasse 8-10 6922 Wolfurt / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states Innova Patent GmbH Rickenbacherstrasse 8-10 6960 Wolfurt / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luger, Peter Schulgasse 25/17 6850 Dornbirn / AT | 02 /
Meindl, Bernd Am Birkengraben 1 6961 Hard / AT | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Hehenberger, Reinhard, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Hehenberger, Reinhard, et al Beer & Partner Patentanwälte KEG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 05450164.8 | 06.10.2005 | [2006/19] | Priority number, date | AT20040001842 | 04.11.2004 Original published format: AT 18422004 | [2006/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655193 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1655193 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B61B12/12 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
B61B12/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Title | German: | Klemmvorrichtung zum Ankuppeln einer Kabine oder eines Sessels an das Förder-bzw. Zugseil einer Seilbahnanlage | [2006/19] | English: | Cable gripper for coupling a cabin or a chair to the hauling/traction cable of a cableway installation | [2006/19] | French: | Pince de serrage pour accoupler une cabine ou un siège au câble transporteur/tracteur d'une installation de téléphérique | [2006/19] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.05.2008 | DK | 21.05.2008 | EE | 21.05.2008 | IE | 21.05.2008 | LT | 21.05.2008 | LV | 21.05.2008 | NL | 21.05.2008 | GR | 22.08.2008 | IS | 21.09.2008 | LU | 06.10.2008 | PT | 21.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | HU | 22.11.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/39] | CY | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
LU | 06.10.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
HU | 22.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | DK | 21.05.2008 | |
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
LU | 06.10.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | DK | 21.05.2008 | |
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | DK | 21.05.2008 | |
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 21.05.2008 | |
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/17] | DK | 21.05.2008 | |
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | DK | 21.05.2008 | |
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 21.05.2008 | |
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | LV | 21.05.2008 | |
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | LV | 21.05.2008 | |
NL | 21.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB984003 (CHARLES SAMUEL LOWE) [A] 1,3* page 2, line 106 - line 121; figures 5,6 *; | [YA]DE2500979 (POHLIG HECKEL BLEICHERT) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,3; | [Y]EP0852198 (POMAGALSKI SA [FR]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 53; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | AT404458B |