EP1716259 - METALLURGICAL VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNOLOGICAL RESOURCES PTY. LTD. 55 Collins Street Melbourne, VIC 3000 / AU | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Stephan, Heinz, Josef, Victor 15, South Perth Esplanade South Perth, Western Australia 6151 / AU | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/44] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstraße 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05700169.5 | 03.02.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005AU00139 | Priority number, date | AU20040900544 | 04.02.2004 Original published format: AU 2004900544 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005075688 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1716259 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C21B7/10, F27D1/12, F27B1/24, F27B3/24 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
F27B3/205 (EP,US);
C21B7/10 (EP,KR,US);
F27B1/12 (EP,US);
F27B1/24 (KR);
F27B3/24 (KR);
F27D1/12 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLURGISCHER BEHÄLTER | [2006/44] | English: | METALLURGICAL VESSEL | [2006/44] | French: | RECIPIENT METALLURGIQUE | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 02.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 18.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/07] | 07.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE20213759U (VOEST ALPINE IND ANLAGEN [AT]) [X] 1-9,27,39-41 * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 35; figures 1-9 *[A] 34,35; | [X]DE10230511 (LIEBIG ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-5,27,39 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0011]; figure . *; | [XP]EP1469085 (WURTH PAUL SA [LU]) [XP] 27,28 * figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]SU840112 ; | [X]JP2003279265 ; | [X]GB2009898 (SANYO SPECIAL STEEL CO LTD); | [X]EP0052039 ; | [X]US4669708 (ROLLOT PIERRE [FR], et al); | [X]US4787605 (KAPTEIN FRANK [NL]); | [X]GB2344639 (BRITISH STEEL PLC [GB], et al); | [X]WO0063446 (DANIELI CORUS TECHNICAL SERVIC [NL], et al); | [X]WO02088398 (SMS DEMAG AG [DE], et al); | [XP]WO2004106831 (MAERZ OFENBAU [CH], et al); | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 15, Database accession no. 1981-30670E, XP008095084 & SU840112 A1 19810626 (BINEVSKII) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 70, Database accession no. 2003-740751, XP008094001 & JP2003279265 A 20031002 (NIPPON CHUZO KK) |