EP1703673 - A METHOD FOR TEARING-DOWN TUNNEL IN WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Wenlin Huawei Admin. Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guang Dong 518129 / CN | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05700395.6 | 06.01.2005 | [2006/38] | WO2005CN00020 | Priority number, date | CN20041000334 | 07.01.2004 Original published format: CN200410000334 | [2006/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005069546 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703673 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L12/56, H04L12/46 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04W12/033 (EP,US);
H04W76/32 (EP,US);
H04L63/0272 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W76/38 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/38] | H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABBAUEN EINES TUNNELS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN LOKALEN NETZWERK | [2006/38] | English: | A METHOD FOR TEARING-DOWN TUNNEL IN WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK | [2006/38] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE SUPPRIMER UN TUNNEL DANS UN RESEAU LOCAL SANS FIL | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2006 | Translation filed | 07.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 18.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2008 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 11.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2008 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/47] | 03.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1093254 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [A] 1-17 * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 35 ** figure 5 *; | [X]WO02069596 (NOKIA INTELLIGENT EDGE ROUTERS [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 3 * * page 14, line 16 - page 15, line 6 * * page 31, line 8 - page 32, line 17 * * page 33, line 7 - line 13 * * figure 5 *; | [X]US6522880 (VERMA ROHIT [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 48 * * column 5, line 14 - line 33 * * column 8, line 9 - line 38 * * figures 2,5 * | International search | [X]WO0217561 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [A]CN1353559 (XIDIAN JIETONG WIRELESS NETWOR [CN]) |