EP1709962 - THE USE OF L-BUTYLPHTHALIDE IN THE MANUFACTURING OF MEDICINES FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF CEREBRAL ISCHEMIA DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 22.11.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shijiazhuang Pharma. Group Zhongqi Pharmaceutical Technology (Shijiazhuang) Co., Ltd. Zhong-Shan West Road 276, Shijiazhuang Hebei 050051 / CN | [2006/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Zhentao No. 276 Zhongshan West Road Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050051 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Hongwu No. 276 Zhongshan West Road Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050051 / CN | 03 /
NIU, Zhanqi No. 276 Zhongshan West Road Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050051 / CN | 04 /
SHEN, Dongmin No. 276 Zhongshan West Road Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050051 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Rongduan No. 276 Zhongshan West Road Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050051 / CN | 06 /
FENG, Xiaolong No. 276 Zhongshan West Road Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050051 / CN | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05700438.4 | 17.01.2005 | [2006/41] | WO2005CN00064 | Priority number, date | CN20041001748 | 20.01.2004 Original published format: CN200410001748 | [2006/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005072725 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1709962 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/343, A61P9/10 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/343 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON L-BUTYLPHTHALID BEI DER HERSTELLUNG VON MEDIKAMENTEN ZUR PRÄVENTION UND BEHANDLUNG ZEREBRALER ISCHÄMIE | [2006/41] | English: | THE USE OF L-BUTYLPHTHALIDE IN THE MANUFACTURING OF MEDICINES FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF CEREBRAL ISCHEMIA DISEASE | [2006/41] | French: | UTILISATION DE L-BUTYLPHTALIDE DANS LA FABRICATION DE MEDICAMENTS DESTINES A PREVENIR ET A TRAITER UNE MALADIE INDUITE PAR L'ISCHEMIE CEREBRALE | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2006 | Translation filed | 09.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 09.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 07.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/52] | 21.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2013 | 22.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP13004735.0 / EP2682117 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CN1257706 [ ] (INST OF MEDICINAL MATERIALS CH [CN]); | [E]EP1679070 (SHIJIAZHUANG PHARMA GROUP [CN], et al) [E] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1757286 (SHIJIAZHUANG PHARMA GROUP [CN], et al) [E] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X] - CHANG QING ET AL, "Effects of chiral 3-n-butylphthalide on apoptosis induced by transient focal cerebral ischemia in rats", ACTA PHARMACOLOGICA SINICA AUG 2003,, (20030801), vol. 24, no. 8, pages 796 - 804, XP002558734 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [X] - XU HAOLIANG ET AL, "EFFECTS OF 3-N-BUTYLPHTHALDE ON PIAL ARTEROLES INFOCAL CEREBRAL ISCHEIA RATS", YAO HSUEH HSUEH PAO - ACTA PHARMACEUTICA SINICA, BEIJING, CN, (19990301), vol. 34, no. 3, ISSN 0513-4870, pages 172 - 175, XP008071717 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - XU HAO-LIANG ET AL, "Inhibitory effects of chiral 3-n-butylphthalide on inflammation following focal ischemic brain injury in rats", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200005), Database accession no. PREV200000331032, XP002558736 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, XP002558735 [X] 1,2 * column A * | [X] - CHONG Z Z ET AL, "Effect of dl-n-butylphthalide on the activity of the choline acetyltransferase in ischemic brain and cultured neurons subjected to hypoglycemia/hypoxia", ZHONGGUO YAOXUE ZAZHI - CHINESE PHARMACEUTICAL JOURNAL, GAI KAN BIAN-WEI-HUI, BEIJING, CN, (19990801), vol. 34, no. 8, ISSN 1001-2494, pages 519 - 522, XP008102416 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - XIONG JIE ET AL, "The protective effect of butylphthalide against mitochondrial injury during cerebral ischemia", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200006), Database accession no. PREV200000498562, XP002559421 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - LIN J F ET AL, "Effect of DL-3-N-butylphthalide on delayed neuronal damage after focal cerebral ischemia and intrasynaptosomes calcium in rats", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1996), Database accession no. PREV199699158021, XP002558737 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - LIU X G ET AL, "[Protective effect of dl-3-n-butylphthalide on ischemic neurological damage and abnormal behavior in rats subjected to focal ischemia]", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (199512), Database accession no. NLM8712015, XP002558738 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - ZHANG L Y ET AL, "[Effect of dl-3-n-butylphthalide (NBP) on life span and neurological deficit in SHRsp rats]", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (1996), Database accession no. NLM8762459, XP002558739 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - FENG Y P ET AL, "[Effect of DL-butylphthalide (NBP) on mouse brain energy metabolism in complete brain ischemia induced by decapitation]", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (1995), Database accession no. NLM8701729, XP002559422 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - YAN C H ET AL, "Effects of dl-3-n-butylphthalide on regional cerebral blood flow in right middle cerebral artery occlusion rats", ZHONGGUO YAO LI XUE BAO = ACTA PHARMACOLOGICA SINICA MAR 1998,, (19980301), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 117 - 120, XP002558745 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - CHONG Z ET AL, "dl-3-n-butylphthalide reduces brain damage in mice with closed head injury.", CHINESE MEDICAL JOURNAL JUL 2000, (200007), vol. 113, no. 7, ISSN 0366-6999, pages 613 - 616, XP002559419 [Y] 1,2 * the whole document * | [Y] - YU S R ET AL, "[Facilitated performance of learning and memory in rats by 3-n-butyl phthalide]", ZHONGGUO YAO LI XUE BAO = ACTA PHARMACOLOGICA SINICA SEP 1988, (198809), vol. 9, no. 5, ISSN 0253-9756, pages 385 - 388, XP002559420 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [PX] - PENG YING ET AL, "Effects of chiral NBP on cerebral infarct volume due to transient focal cerebral ischemia", ZHONGGUO XIN YAO ZAZHI - CHINESE NEW DRUGS JOURNAL, GAI-KAN BIANJIBU, BEIJING, CN, (20050101), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 1003-3734, pages 420 - 423, XP001539275 [PX] 1,2 * abstract * | [ ] - ACTA PHARMACOLOGICA SINICA, (200005), vol. 21, no. 5, ISSN 0253-9756, pages 433 - 438 | [ ] - YAOXUE XUEBAO, (200006), vol. 35, no. 6, ISSN 0513-4870, pages 408 - 412 | [ ] - YAOXUE XUEBAO, (1996), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0513-4870, pages 166 - 170 | [ ] - YAO XUE XUE BAO = ACTA PHARMACEUTICA SINICA DEC 1995, (199512), vol. 30, no. 12, ISSN 0513-4870, pages 896 - 903 | [ ] - YAO XUE XUE BAO = ACTA PHARMACEUTICA SINICA 1996, (1996), vol. 31, no. 1, ISSN 0513-4870, pages 18 - 23 | [ ] - YAO XUE XUE BAO = ACTA PHARMACEUTICA SINICA 1995, (1995), vol. 30, no. 10, ISSN 0513-4870, pages 741 - 744 | International search | [X]CN1100097 (PHARMACOLOGY INST CHINESE ACAD [CN]); | [X] - HU D. ET AL, "Effect of dl-n-butylphthalide on mermory disturbance induced by focal cerebral ischemia in rats", CHINESE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND TOXICOLOGY, (199702), vol. 11, no. 1, XP008111297 | [X] - YAN C-H. ET AL, "Effect of dl-n-butylphthalide on striatum cerebral blood flow in normal and middle cerebral artery occlusion rats", CHINESE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND TOXICOLOGY, (199802), vol. 12, no. 1, XP008111296 | Examination | - DENG W ET AL, "Effect of dl-3-n-butylphthalide on brain edema in rats subjected to focal cerebral ischemia.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (199706), Database accession no. NLM11324493, XP002716864 | - WANG XING-WANG, "3-n-Butylphthalide: Cerebral antiischemic", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (200001), vol. 25, no. 1, ISSN 0377-8282, pages 16 - 23, XP002716865 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2000.025.01.562281 | - CHINESE MEDICAL SCIENCES JOURNAL = CHUNG-KUO I HSÜEH K'O HSÜEH TSA CHIH / CHINESE ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES JUN 1997, (199706), vol. 12, no. 2, ISSN 1001-9294, pages 102 - 106 |