EP1704092 - VEHICLE SEAT, PARTICULARLY AN AIR PASSENGER SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2010/13] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ILIAS, Erwin Obere Äcker , 14 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | 02 /
HEUSER, Jörg Gelbinger Gasse 38 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | [2006/52] |
Former [2006/39] | 01 /
ILIAS, Erwin Grundwiesenweg 59 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | ||
02 /
HEUSER, Jörg Gelbinger Gasse 38 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/15] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/39] | Schildberg, Peter Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05700856.7 | 12.01.2005 | [2006/39] | WO2005EP00237 | Priority number, date | DE20041002169 | 12.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004002169 | [2006/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005066023 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1704092 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1704092 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/06 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
B64D11/06 (EP,US);
B64D11/064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/26] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSITZ, INSBESONDERE FLUGGASTSITZ | [2006/39] | English: | VEHICLE SEAT, PARTICULARLY AN AIR PASSENGER SEAT | [2006/39] | French: | SIEGE POUR VEHICULE, EN PARTICULIER POUR PASSAGER D'UN AERONEF | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.01.2005 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | ES | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | IT | 02.07.2014 | LT | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | PL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | SE | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | IS | 02.11.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | AT | 12.01.2015 | IE | 12.01.2015 | LU | 12.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/25] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
AT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 12.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
IE | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 12.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 02.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DYA]DE10214104 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document * [A] 11; | [Y]US2595582 (HOVEN ALFRED C, et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO02066283 (RECARO AIRCRAFT SEATING GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 11 * the whole document *; | [A]US3744843 (BARECKI C, et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3433590 (KEIPER RECARO GMBH CO [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 17; figure 2 *; | [A]US3762766 (BARECKI C, et al) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 38; figures 27-30 *; | [A]DE2153578 (KAESSBOHRER FAHRZEUG KARL) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5540483 (MARECHAL ROBERT R [FR]) [A] 1-6 * figure 7 * | by applicant | DE10214104 | DE19534024 |