EP1713771 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A NEW CRYSTALLINE FORM OF PERINDOPRIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/43] | NEW CRYSTALLINE FORM OF PERINDOPRIL | ||
[2013/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d. Verovskova 57 1526 Ljubljana / SI | [2010/10] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d. Verovskova 57 1526 Ljubljana / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUCMAN, Rudolf Spodnje Gameljne 72 1211 Ljubljana-Smartno / SI | [2006/43] | Representative(s) | Kröger, Bernd, et al Sandoz International GmbH Global Patents Department Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | Kröger, Bernd, et al Sandoz International GmbH Global Patents Department Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | ||
Former [2006/43] | Hodzar, Damjan Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 05700893.0 | 13.01.2005 | [2006/43] | WO2005EP00283 | Priority number, date | SI20040000012 | 14.01.2004 Original published format: SI 200400012 | [2006/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005068425 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1713771 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1713771 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/42, A61K31/475, A61P9/12 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
C07D209/42 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/43] | Extension states | HR | 14.08.2006 | YU | 14.08.2006 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EINER NEUEN KRISTALLINEN FORM VON PERINDOPRIL | [2013/38] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A NEW CRYSTALLINE FORM OF PERINDOPRIL | [2013/38] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION D'UNE NOUVELLE FORME CRISTALLINE DE PERINDOPRIL | [2013/38] |
Former [2006/43] | NEUE KRISTALLINE FORM VON PERINDOPRIL | ||
Former [2006/43] | NEW CRYSTALLINE FORM OF PERINDOPRIL | ||
Former [2006/43] | NOUVELLE FORME CRISTALLINE DE PERINDOPRIL | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 13.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2005 | AT | 05.03.2014 | BE | 05.03.2014 | CY | 05.03.2014 | CZ | 05.03.2014 | DK | 05.03.2014 | EE | 05.03.2014 | ES | 05.03.2014 | FI | 05.03.2014 | IT | 05.03.2014 | LT | 05.03.2014 | MC | 05.03.2014 | NL | 05.03.2014 | PL | 05.03.2014 | RO | 05.03.2014 | SE | 05.03.2014 | SI | 05.03.2014 | SK | 05.03.2014 | TR | 05.03.2014 | BG | 05.06.2014 | GR | 06.06.2014 | IS | 05.07.2014 | PT | 07.07.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 05.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0308341 (ADIR [FR]) [X] 3 * example 3c *; | [X]DE19721290 (KRKA TOVARNA ZDRAVIL D D [SI]) [X] 5 * the whole document *; | [YD]EP1296948 (SERVIER LAB [FR]) [YD] 16-26* the whole document *; | [YDX]WO03064388 (SERVIER LAB [FR], et al) [YD] 16-26 * example 5 * [X] 3; | [X]EP1371659 (SERVIER LAB [FR]) [X] 3 * example 1d *; | [X] - VINCENT M ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND ACE INHIBITORY ACTIVITY OF THE STEREOISOMERS OF PERINDOPRIL (S 9490) AND PERINDOPRILATE (S 9780)", DRUG DESIGN AND DISCOVERY, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS GMBH, (1992), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1055-9612, pages 11 - 28, XP000885876 [X] 1-4,8-26 * page 27, paragraph 4 * |