EP1706655 - DEVICE FOR SEALING THE BALL SIDE OF A BEARING OF A ROLLER STUD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS group GmbH Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2015/31] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states SMS Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states SMS Demag Aktiengesellschaft Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROEINGH, Konrad Auf der Heide 1 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | 02 /
KELLER, Karl Auf der Hütte 12 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | 03 /
SCHEFFE, Kurt In der Himbeerwiese 6 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Klüppel, Walter, et al Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstraße 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [2016/41] |
Former [2006/50] | Klüppel, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05701001.9 | 18.01.2005 | [2006/40] | WO2005EP00427 | Priority number, date | DE20041003763 | 23.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004003763 | [2006/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005071278 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1706655 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1706655 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16C13/02, F16C33/74, B21B31/07, F16J15/324, F16J15/3236 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
F16C33/74 (EP,KR,US);
F16C13/02 (EP,KR,US);
B21B31/078 (EP,US);
F16J15/32 (KR);
F16J15/3236 (EP,US);
F16J15/324 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/40] | F16C13/02, F16C33/74, B21B31/07, F16J15/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/41] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BALLENSEITIGEN ABDICHTUNG DES LAGERS EINES WALZENZAPFENS | [2006/40] | English: | DEVICE FOR SEALING THE BALL SIDE OF A BEARING OF A ROLLER STUD | [2006/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR ETANCHEIFIER LE COUSSINET D'UN TOURILLON DE CYLINDRE COTE TABLE | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2005 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | AT | 18.01.2017 | IE | 18.01.2017 | LU | 18.01.2017 | BE | 31.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | FR | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.01.2005 | |
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.01.2005 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | ES | 12.10.2016 | |
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | Cited in | International search | [YA]JPH0949572 ; | [Y]DE2414634 (SIMMERWERKE SIMMER KG) [Y] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document *; | [XY]US4679801 (POLONI ALFREDO [IT]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 7; figures 1,2 * [Y] 13; | [Y]FR2676943 (CLECIM SA [FR]) [Y] 1,2,4-6 * page 9, line 6 - line 24; figure 2 *; | [A]DE29805241U (KARK UWE [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,6,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1038601 (KVAERNER METALS DAVY LTD [GB]) [A] 1,3,4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE10113593 (SMS DEMAG AG [DE]) [DA] * the whole document * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09049572 A 19970218 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD; KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [Y] 13 * abstract * [A] 1,3,4,6,7 |