EP1716454 - PROJECTION OBJECTIVE FOR A MICROLITHOGRAPHIC PROJECTION EXPOSURE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss SMT AG Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSTALSKI, Hans-Jürgen Dietrich-Bonhoeffer-Strasse 9 73447 Oberkochen / DE | 02 /
DODOC, Aurelian Hainbuchenweg 7 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Schwanhäusser, Gernot Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestrasse 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Schwanhäusser, Gernot Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte Epplestr. 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05701137.1 | 24.01.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005EP00641 | Priority number, date | US20040542924P | 09.02.2004 Original published format: US 542924 P | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005076084 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1716454 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
G03F7/70341 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROJEKTIONSOBJEKTIV FÜR EINE MIKROLITHOGRAPHISCHE PROJEKTIONSBELICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2006/44] | English: | PROJECTION OBJECTIVE FOR A MICROLITHOGRAPHIC PROJECTION EXPOSURE APPARATUS | [2006/44] | French: | OBJECTIF DE PROJECTION POUR APPAREIL D'EXPOSITION MICROLITHOGRAPHIQUE A PROJECTION | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/10] | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2007/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YXA]DD224448 (ZEISS JENA VEB CARL [DD]) [Y] 1,10,14 * page 4 - page 6; figures 1-3 * [X] 15 [A] 11; | [Y]EP0638847 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [Y] 1,10,14 * column 5, line 42 - line 50 * * column 12, line 35 - line 41 *; | [PYD]EP1431826 (ZEISS CARL SMT AG [DE]) [PYD] 1 * columns 60,61 * |