EP1711559 - COMPOSITION FOR YARNS, YARNS HAVING IMPROVED PROPERTIES AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexis Fibers AG Gerliswilstrasse 6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | [2010/20] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Rhodia Industrial Yarns AG Gerliswilstrasse 17 6021 Emmenbrucke / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATTENHOFER, Christian Giebelweg 9 CH-6343 BUONAS / CH | 02 /
SCHAFFNER, Paul Weinhalde 12 CH-6010 KRIENS / CH | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Bohest AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [2008/31] | Hoechst, Bruno Werner, et al BOHEST AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2007/20] | Hoechst, Bruno Werner, et al Bohest Intellectual Property A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2006/42] | Esson, Jean-Pierre, et al Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle Centre de Recherches de Lyon BP 62 69192 Saint-Fons Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05701147.0 | 20.01.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005EP00667 | Priority number, date | FR20040000604 | 22.01.2004 Original published format: FR 0400604 | [2006/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005075559 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1711559 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1711559 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/227, D06M15/643, D06M15/263, C08L35/02, C08L23/30, C08L83/04 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C08L35/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/30 (EP,KR,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR,US);
D06M15/227 (EP,KR,US);
D06M15/263 (EP,KR,US);
D06M15/643 (EP,KR,US);
D07B1/142 (EP,US);
D06M2200/35 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/02, C08L2666/18 (EP,US);
C08L23/02, C08L83/00 (US,EP);
C08L23/30, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L35/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2006/42] | C08L35/02, C08L23/30, C08L83/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR GARNE, GARNE MIT VERBESSERTEN EIGENSCHAFTEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2006/42] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR YARNS, YARNS HAVING IMPROVED PROPERTIES AND USE THEREOF | [2006/42] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR FILS; FILS A PROPRIETES AMELIOREES ET UTILISATION DE CES FILS | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 26.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   16.02.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.2010 | CY | 02.06.2010 | CZ | 02.06.2010 | DK | 02.06.2010 | EE | 02.06.2010 | FI | 02.06.2010 | HU | 02.06.2010 | IE | 02.06.2010 | IT | 02.06.2010 | LT | 02.06.2010 | NL | 02.06.2010 | PL | 02.06.2010 | RO | 02.06.2010 | SE | 02.06.2010 | SI | 02.06.2010 | SK | 02.06.2010 | TR | 02.06.2010 | BG | 02.09.2010 | GR | 03.09.2010 | ES | 13.09.2010 | IS | 02.10.2010 | PT | 04.10.2010 | GB | 20.01.2011 | LU | 20.01.2011 | BE | 31.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | FR | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HU | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
TR | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
GB | 20.01.2011 | ||
LU | 20.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
TR | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
GB | 20.01.2011 | ||
LU | 20.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
GB | 20.01.2011 | ||
LU | 20.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
GB | 20.01.2011 | ||
LU | 20.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
GB | 20.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
IT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0244500 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-22 * example 3 * * page 2, line 33 - line 42 *; | [A]WO03033811 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-22* page 11, line 4 - line 11 *; | [A]WO03066959 (MILLIKEN & CO [US]) [A] 1-22 * page 3, line 23 - line 26 * * example 1 * |