EP1713502 - HIGHLY CONCENTRATED LIQUID FORMULATIONS OF ANTI-EGFR ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2006/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHEUS, Susanne Realschulstrasse 19 54347 Neumagen-Dhron / DE | 02 /
MAHLER, Hanns-Christian Buschungstrasse 54a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2006/43] | Application number, filing date | 05701212.2 | 27.01.2005 | [2006/43] | WO2005EP00797 | Priority number, date | US20040543549P | 12.02.2004 Original published format: US 543549 P | [2006/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005077414 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1713502 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K9/08, A61P35/00 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
A61K9/08 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | 03.07.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHKONZENTRIERTE, FLÜSSIGE FORMULIERUNGEN VON ANTI-EGFR-ANTIKÖRPERN | [2006/43] | English: | HIGHLY CONCENTRATED LIQUID FORMULATIONS OF ANTI-EGFR ANTIBODIES | [2006/43] | French: | FORMULATIONS LIQUIDES FORTEMENT CONCENTREES D'ANTICORPS ANTI-EGFR | [2006/43] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/20] | 08.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03007988 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 8,9,12-20 * page 4 *; | [X]WO03053465 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 8,9,12-20 * page 4 * * pages 5-6 * * examples 3-5 *; | [Y]WO02096457 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-20 * page 4 * * pages 8,10,17 * * examples 2,7,8,10 *; | [Y]WO2004001007 (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * pages 2-3 * * pages 6,11 * * pages 14-16 * * pages 20-23 *; | [Y]US6252055 (RELTON JULIAN MARCUS [GB]) [Y] 1-20 * columns 2,5 * * examples 1,2 *; | [Y]CH684164 (ROTKREUZSTIFTUNG ZENTRALLAB) [Y] 1-20 * pages 4-5 *; | [YP]WO2004085474 (IMCLONE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [YP] 1-20 * page 23 *; | [YP] - HARRIS REED J ET AL, "Commercial manufacturing scale formulation and analytical characterization of therapeutic recombinant antibodies", DRUG DEVELOPMENT RESEARCH, (200403), vol. 61, no. 3, ISSN 0272-4391, pages 137 - 154, XP002324970 [YP] 1-20 * pages 145-147 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ddr.10344 | [T] - VAN REIS, ZYDNEY, In Encyclopedia of bioprocess technology: fermentation, biocatalysis and bioseparation, WILEY & SONS, (1999), XP009046105 [T] 1-20 * page 2197 - page 2214 * | Examination | - HARDING JOANNE ET AL, "Cetuximab: an epidermal growth factor receptor chemeric human-murine monoclonal antibody.", DRUGS OF TODAY (BARCELONA, SPAIN : 1998) FEB 2005 LNKD- PUBMED:15821783, (200502), vol. 41, no. 2, ISSN 1699-3993, pages 107 - 127 | - SUSANNE MATHEUS ET AL, "A Critical Evaluation of Tm(FTIR) Measurements of High-Concentration IgG1 Antibody Formulations as a Formulation Development Tool", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NL, (20060621), vol. 23, no. 7, doi:10.1007/S11095-006-0283-9, ISSN 1573-904X, pages 1617 - 1627, XP019405151 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-006-0283-9 | - SRIDHAR S S ET AL, "Inhibitors of epidermal-growth-factor receptors: a review of clinical research with a focus on non-small-cell lung cancer", LANCET ONCOLOGY, LANCET PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (20030701), vol. 4, no. 7, doi:10.1016/S1470-2045(03)01137-9, ISSN 1470-2045, pages 397 - 406, XP004809825 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1470-2045(03)01137-9 | - FRACASSO-PM ET AL, "A study to assess the pharmacokinetics (PK) and pharmacodynamics (PD) of a single infusion of cetuximab (IMC-C225).", PROC AM SOC CLIN ONCOL, (ABSTR 787), vol. 22, (20111201), 2003 ASCO Annual Meeting |