|
28.10.2021 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2021 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.10.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.2021 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.2021 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.08.2021 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.07.2021 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2019 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2019 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.09.2019 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2019 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2019 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
28 |
|
10.01.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2018 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.09.2018 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2018 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.08.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
15.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.07.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
67 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
03.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2014 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Opposition |
25 |
|
01.10.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2014 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.05.2014 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2014 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
30.09.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2011 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.05.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.08.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
06.09.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.07.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.06.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
55 |