EP1711317 - MACHINE VISION CONTROLLED ROBOT TOOL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wisematic OY PL 589 33101 Tampere / FI | [2006/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDELIN, Teemu Pellervonkatu 3, F 96 FI-33540 Tampere / FI | 02 /
UUSITALO, Jani Härmälänsaarenkatu 12 as 8 FI-33900 Tampere / FI | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Rahkonen, Erkki Juhani Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | Rahkonen, Erkki Juhani Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy, Hermiankatu 12 B 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 05701771.7 | 28.01.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005FI50016 | Priority number, date | FI20040005020 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: FI 20045020 | [2006/42] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005072917 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1711317 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1711317 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B25J13/08, B25J19/00 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
B25J19/023 (EP);
B25J13/08 (FI);
B25J15/0475 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINENSICHTGESTEUERTES ROBOTERWERKZEUGSYSTEM | [2006/42] | English: | MACHINE VISION CONTROLLED ROBOT TOOL SYSTEM | [2006/42] | French: | SYSTEME D'OUTIL ROBOTIQUE COMMANDE PAR VISIONIQUE | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 15.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 12.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | CY | 13.08.2008 | CZ | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | EE | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | LT | 13.08.2008 | PL | 13.08.2008 | RO | 13.08.2008 | SI | 13.08.2008 | SK | 13.08.2008 | TR | 13.08.2008 | BG | 13.11.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | IS | 13.12.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | GB | 28.01.2009 | IE | 28.01.2009 | LU | 28.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | HU | 14.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
GB | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
LU | 28.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
GB | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
LU | 28.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
GB | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
GB | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
GB | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
GB | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
GB | 28.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 13.08.2008 | |
IS | 13.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4380696 (MASAKI ICHIRO); | [A]DE3612144 (HINKEL RALF); | [X]EP0260984 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [A]US4753569 (PRYOR TIMOTHY R [CA]); | [X]US5219264 (MCCLURE VIRGE W [US], et al); | [A]WO03064116 (BRAINTECH CANADA INC [CA], et al) |