EP1706752 - JTAG TEST ARCHITECTURE FOR MULTI-CHIP PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TALAYSSAT, Jacky, c/o Société Civile SPID 156 Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 PARIS / FR | 02 /
BUWALDA, Sake, c/o Société Civile SPID 156 Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 PARIS / FR | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street, Redhill Surrey RH1 1NY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd. Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
Former [2007/01] | White, Andrew Gordon, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2006/49] | van Oudheusden-Perset, Laure E., et al Société Civile SPID 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/40] | Chaffraix, Jean Société Civile SPID, 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05702239.4 | 05.01.2005 | [2006/40] | WO2005IB00072 | Priority number, date | EP20040300016 | 13.01.2004 Original published format: EP 04300016 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005069025 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1706752 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1706752 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/3185 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
G01R31/318558 (EP,US);
G01R31/3183 (KR);
G01R31/26 (KR);
G01R31/318536 (EP,US);
H01L22/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | JTAG-TESTARCHITEKTUR FÜR EIN MEHRCHIP-PACK | [2006/40] | English: | JTAG TEST ARCHITECTURE FOR MULTI-CHIP PACK | [2006/40] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DE TEST JTAG POUR BOITIER MULTIPUCE | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 10.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2008 | BE | 07.05.2008 | CY | 07.05.2008 | CZ | 07.05.2008 | DK | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | FI | 07.05.2008 | IT | 07.05.2008 | LT | 07.05.2008 | NL | 07.05.2008 | PL | 07.05.2008 | RO | 07.05.2008 | SI | 07.05.2008 | SK | 07.05.2008 | TR | 07.05.2008 | BG | 07.08.2008 | SE | 07.08.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | ES | 18.08.2008 | IS | 07.09.2008 | PT | 07.10.2008 | HU | 08.11.2008 | IE | 05.01.2009 | LU | 05.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
HU | 08.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.01.2009 | ||
LU | 05.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
IE | 05.01.2009 | ||
LU | 05.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
IE | 05.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
IE | 05.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 07.05.2008 | |
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 07.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5491666 (STURGES JAY [US]) [A] 1-20* column 9, line 32 - column 10, line 31; figure 6; claim 1 *; | [X]US5862152 (HANDLY PAUL ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 19 - column 5, line 8; figure 2 *; | [A] - HILLA S C ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "BOUNDARY SCAN TESTING FOR MULTICHIP MODULES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE. BALTIMORE, SEPT. 20, (19920920), vol. CONF. 23, ISBN 0-7803-0760-7, pages 224 - 231, XP000348757 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |