EP1708616 - SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR MANAGING PHYSIOLOGICAL INFORMATION RELATING TO A TERMINAL USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HJELT, Kari Kavallinmäki 17 FIN-02750 Espoo / FI | 02 /
FRIMAN, Jonni Lukiokatu 9 B 8 FIN-13100 Hämeenlinna / FI | 03 /
JÄRVI, Jyrki Lauttasaarentie 21 A 3 FIN-00200 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
NAUKKARINEN, Santtu Tornitaso 1 as 19 FIN-02120 Espoo / FI | 05 /
OLLIKAINEN, Jarkko Sinivuokontie 16 FIN-05800 Hyvinkää / FI | 06 /
NIHTILÄ, Jukka Sepontie 1 V FIN-12130 Espoo / FI | 07 /
RYHÄNEN, Tapani Luoteisväylä 31 as 3 FIN-00200 Helsinki / FI | 08 /
VITIKAINEN, Timo Sotilastorpantie 26 FIN-02680 Espoo / FI | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2016/18] |
Former [2009/37] | Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby Derbyshire DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2008/35] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2008/01] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2006/41] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05702343.4 | 24.01.2005 | [2006/41] | WO2005IB00184 | Priority number, date | US20040540607P | 31.01.2004 Original published format: US 540607 P | US20040853702 | 25.05.2004 Original published format: US 853702 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005079667 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1708616 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1708616 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61N1/372 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
A61B5/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61N1/37247 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
A63B24/0075 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H20/30 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/47] | A61N1/05, A61N1/372, // A61B19/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/41] | A61B5/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2006/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT FÜR DIE VERWALTUNG PHYSIOLOGISCHER INFORMATIONEN ÜBER ENDGERÄTBENUTZER | [2006/41] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR MANAGING PHYSIOLOGICAL INFORMATION RELATING TO A TERMINAL USER | [2006/41] | French: | SYSTEME, PROCEDE ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS PHYSIOLOGIQUES RELATIVES A L'UTILISATEUR D'UN TERMINAL | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 17.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.10.2015 | 07.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16158899.1 / EP3118757 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2005 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | IS | 04.09.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | IE | 24.01.2017 | LU | 24.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 24.01.2005 | |
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 24.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.01.2005 | |
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 24.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 24.01.2005 | |
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 24.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.01.2005 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 24.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 24.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
LU | 24.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | LT | 04.05.2016 | |
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0200111 (BODYMEDIA INC [US]); | [A]US2002133378 (MAULT JAMES R [US], et al); | [A]US2003208110 (MAULT JAMES R [US], et al); | [X]US2004002634 (NIHTILA JUKKA [FI]) | Examination | US2004002634 |