EP1709564 - AUTOMATIC CONTRAST MEDIUM CONTROL IN IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2006/41] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AACH, Til, c/o Philips Intellectual Property Stan dards GmbH, Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
CONDURACHE, A., c/o Philips Intellectual Property Standards GmbH, Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 03 /
ECK, Kai, c/o Philips Intellectual Property Standards GmbH, Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 04 /
BREDNO, Jörg, c/o Philips Intellectual Property S tandards GmbH, Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Schindelmann, Peter C/o Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 D-80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Schindelmann, Peter Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/41] | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05702602.3 | 06.01.2005 | [2006/41] | WO2005IB50077 | Priority number, date | EP20040100119 | 15.01.2004 Original published format: EP 04100119 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005071595 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1709564 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10116 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE KONTRASTMITTELSTEUERUNG IN BILDERN | [2006/41] | English: | AUTOMATIC CONTRAST MEDIUM CONTROL IN IMAGES | [2006/41] | French: | COMMANDE AUTOMATIQUE DE MILIEU DE CONTRASTE DANS DES IMAGES | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6052476 (QIAN JIANZHONG [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-12 * abstract, col. 3 line 1-col. 6 line 23, col. 7 lines 40-50, col. 11 line 29-col 15 line 39 *; | [X]US6195579 (CARROLL TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-12 * abstract, col. 4 lines 5- col. 6 line 50, col. 11 line 1- col. 12 line 51, Fig. 9 *; | [X]US6639211 (ANAND CHRISTOPHER K [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-12 * abstract, Fig. 2, col. 5 line 55-col. 6 line 15, claims 1,5 *; | [X] - TORHEIM G ET AL, "FEATURE EXTRACTION AND CLASSIFICATION OF DYNAMIC CONTRAST-ENHANCED T2-WEIGHTED BREAST IMAGE DATA", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200112), vol. 20, no. 12, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 1293 - 1301, XP001101458 [X] 1-7,10-12 * abstract, section II.C * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/42.974924 | [X] - JUNHWAN KIM ET AL, "A segmentation algorithm for contrast-enhanced images", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EIGHT IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION. (ICCV). NICE, FRANCE, OCT. 13 - 16, 2003, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20031013), VOL. 2 OF 2. CONF. 9, ISBN 0-7695-1950-4, pages 502 - 509, XP010662330 [X] 1-7,10-12 * abstract, sections 1.1, 3-5, 7 * | [XP] - AACH T, CONDURACHE A, ECK K, BREDNO J, "Statistical Model Based Identification of Complete Vessel Tree Frames in Coronary Angiograms", COMPUTATIONAL IMAGING II, EDITED BY BOUMAN, MILLER, PROC. OF SPIE ELECTRONIC IMAGING, SPIE, (200405), vol. 5299, pages 283 - 294, XP002321038 [XP] 1-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.526605 |