EP1716537 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE PROCESSING OF SECTIONAL IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2009/47] |
Former [2009/11] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2006/44] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIEGERT, Jens, Philips Intel. Prop. & Std. GmbH. Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
ROSE, Georg, Philips Intel. Prop. & Std. GmbH. Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 03 /
WEESE, Jürgen, hilips Intel. Prop. & Std. GmbH. Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/52] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2007/18] | Schindelmann, Peter Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/44] | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05702857.3 | 01.02.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005IB50419 | Priority number, date | EP20040100517 | 11.02.2004 Original published format: EP 04100517 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005078661 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1716537 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1716537 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/50, G06T11/00 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
G06T11/005 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERABREITUNG VON SCHNITTBILDERN | [2006/44] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE PROCESSING OF SECTIONAL IMAGES | [2006/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE D'IMAGES EN COUPE | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.2009 | BE | 11.03.2009 | CY | 11.03.2009 | CZ | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | EE | 11.03.2009 | FI | 11.03.2009 | IT | 11.03.2009 | LT | 11.03.2009 | NL | 11.03.2009 | PL | 11.03.2009 | RO | 11.03.2009 | SI | 11.03.2009 | SK | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | BG | 11.06.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | ES | 22.06.2009 | IS | 11.07.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | HU | 12.09.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CY | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
HU | 12.09.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CY | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [IY] - READER A J ET AL, "Adaptive correction of scatter and random events for 3-D backprojected PET data", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE IEEE USA, (200108), vol. 48, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9499, pages 1350 - 1356, XP002323902 [I] 1,3-10 * page 1350, column R - page 1352, column L; figure 2 * [Y] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/23.958351 | [XY] - WATSON C C, "New, faster, image-based scatter correction for 3D PET", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE IEEE USA, (20000804), vol. 47, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9499, pages 1587 - 1594, XP002323734 [X] 1 * page 1588 - page 1589; figures 4,5 * [Y] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/23.873020 | [A] - ZAIDI H, "Scatter modelling and correction strategies in fully 3-D PET", NUCLEAR MEDICINE COMMUNICATIONS, (200111), vol. 22, no. 11, ISSN 0143-3636, pages 1181 - 1184, XP002323903 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00006231-200111000-00003 | [A] - CHERRY S R ET AL, "Effects of scatter on model parameter estimates in 3D PET studies of the human brain", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE USA, (199508), vol. 42, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9499, pages 1174 - 1179, XP002323904 [A] 1-10 * page 1175, column R, paragraph L; figures 1,3,9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/23.467730 | Examination | - LOVE L.A.; KRUGER R.A., "SCATTER ESTIMATION FOR A DIGITAL RADIOGRAPHIC SYSTEM USING CONVOLUTION FILTERING", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (198703), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 178 - 185, XP000670575 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.596126 |