EP1726261 - ULTRASONOGRAPHIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION 1-14, Uchikanda-1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AZUMA, Takashi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Central Res. Lab. 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 1858601 / JP | 02 /
UMEMURA, Shin-ichiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Central Res. Lab., 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 1858601 / JP | 03 /
KURIBARA, Hiroshi c/o Hitachi Medical Corp. 1-14, Uchikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010047 / JP | 04 /
HAYASHI, Tatsuya c/o Hitachi Medical Corp. 1-14, Uchikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010047 / JP | [2014/29] |
Former [2006/48] | 01 /
Azuma, Takashi, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Central Res. Lab. 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 1858601 / JP | ||
02 /
Umemura, Shin-ichiro, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Central Res. Lab., 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 1858601 / JP | |||
03 /
Kuribara, Hiroshi, c/o Hitachi Medical Corp. 1-14, Uchikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010047 / JP | |||
04 /
Hayashi, Tatsuya, c/o Hitachi Medical Corp. 1-14, Uchikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010047 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/29] | Strehl, Peter Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Strehl, Peter Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/48] | Strehl, Peter Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05703319.3 | 06.01.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005JP00047 | Priority number, date | JP20040069984 | 12.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004069984 | [2006/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005087109 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726261 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726261 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00, G01S7/524 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
G01S15/102 (EP,US);
A61B8/481 (EP,US);
G01S15/8959 (EP,US);
G01S15/8963 (EP,US);
G01S7/52039 (EP,US);
G01S7/5202 (EP,US);
G01S7/52038 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/48] | A61B8/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/25] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLGERÄT | [2006/48] | English: | ULTRASONOGRAPHIC DEVICE | [2006/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF PAR ULTRASONS | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2006 | Translation filed | 06.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 20.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 16.07.2014 | [2015/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5984869 (CHIAO RICHARD YUNG [US], et al) [A] 1,2* column 6, lines 10-24 *; | [A]US2004039283 (BANJANIN ZORAN [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0020] * | International search | [Y]JP2001061841 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2003038490 (NOVASONICS INC); | [A]JPH08628 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP); | [Y] - UMEMURA S.I. ET AL, "Triplet Pulse sequence for superior microbubble/tissue contrast", 2003 IEEE ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS, (200310), pages 429 - 432, XP010702256 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.2003.1293438 | [A] - WILKENING W. ET AL, "Phase-Coded Pulse Sequence for Non-Linear Imaging", 2000 IEEE ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM, PROCEEDINGS, (200010), pages 1559 - 1562, XP010540912 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.2000.921621 | [A] - UMEMURA S.I. ET AL, "Enhancement of Sonodynamic Tissue Damage Production by Second-Harmonic Superimposition: Theoretical Analysis of Its Mechanism", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, (1996), vol. 43, no. 6, pages 1054 - 1062, XP000636974 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/58.542456 |