EP1704908 - CELL STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2014/14] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIKAWA, Yukihito, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678530 / JP | 02 /
HIRAI, Sadaaki, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678530 / JP | [2014/14] |
Former [2006/39] | 01 /
ICHIKAWA, Yukihito, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678530 / JP | ||
02 /
HIRAI, Sadaaki, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678530 / JP | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2006/39] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05703545.3 | 13.01.2005 | [2006/39] | WO2005JP00306 | Priority number, date | JP20040008263 | 15.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004008263 | [2006/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005068048 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1704908 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1704908 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/20, B01D53/94, B01J35/04, F01N3/02 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
B01D46/0036 (EP,US);
B01D46/2429 (EP,US);
B01D46/2444 (US);
B01D46/24491 (EP,US);
B01D46/2498 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
C04B38/0009 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5089 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/85 (EP,US);
C04B41/89 (EP,US);
B01D2257/602 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2111/0081 (EP,US);
F01N13/14 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,US);
F01N2330/48 (EP,US);
Y02W30/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24165 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/00, C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B35/195, C04B38/0006 (US,EP);
C04B41/5089, C04B14/46, C04B41/4582, C04B41/5022 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B14/46, C04B18/082, C04B41/5024, C04B41/5089 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/16] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZELLENSTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2006/39] | English: | CELL STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2006/39] | French: | STRUCTURE CELLULAIRE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2006 | Translation filed | 25.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3441381 (KEITH CARL D, et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 47 - line 72; figure 6 * | International search | [A]JPS6222823U ; | [Y]JPH05269388 ; | [X]JPH1136853 (CORNING INC); | [AP]JP2004075524 (HITACHI METALS LTD) | by applicant | JPS63144836 | JPH03269388 | JPH03275309 |