EP1714887 - MOUTH CYLINDRICAL PART OF SYNTHETIC RESIN BOTTLE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd. No. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8531 / JP | [2006/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Toshimasa c/o Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd 2-6, Ojima 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8531 / JP | 02 /
IIZUKA, Takao c/o Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd 2-6, Ojima 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8531 / JP | 03 /
KOSHIDAKA, Yukio c/o Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd Matsudo Plant 310 Minoridai Matsudo-shi Chiba 270-2297 / JP | 04 /
SHIMIZU, Kazuhiko c/o Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd Matsudo Plant 310 Minoridai Matsudo-shi Chiba 270-2297 / JP | [2011/13] |
Former [2006/43] | 01 /
TANAKA, Toshimasa, c/o Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd 2-6, Ojima 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8531 / JP | ||
02 /
IIZUKA, Takao, c/o Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd 2-6, Ojima 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8531 / JP | |||
03 /
KOSHIDAKA, Yukio, c/o Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd Matsudo Plant 310 Minoridai Matsudo-shi, Chiba 270-2297 / JP | |||
04 /
SHIMIZU, Kazuhiko, c/o Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd Matsudo Plant 310 Minoridai Matsudo-shi, Chiba 270-2297 / JP | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingeisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/43] | Klingseisen, Franz Zumstein & Klingseisen Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05704064.4 | 25.01.2005 | [2006/43] | WO2005JP00883 | Priority number, date | JP20040024304 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004024304 | JP20040024626 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004024626 | [2006/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005073096 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1714887 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1714887 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/02 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
B65D1/0246 (EP,US);
B65D1/02 (KR);
B65D1/0223 (EP,US);
B65D1/26 (KR);
B29B11/08 (EP,US);
B29B11/14 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/072 (EP,US);
B29C2949/074 (EP,US);
B29C2949/077 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0773 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0777 (EP,US);
B29C2949/22 (EP,US);
B29C2949/24 (EP,US);
B29C2949/26 (EP,US);
B29C2949/28 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3024 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3032 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/071 (EP);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/19] |
Former [2006/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZYLINDRISCHES HALSTEIL EINES KUNSTHARZFLASCHENKÖRPERS | [2006/43] | English: | MOUTH CYLINDRICAL PART OF SYNTHETIC RESIN BOTTLE BODY | [2006/43] | French: | EMBOUCHURE CYLINDRIQUE DU CORPS DE BOUTEILLE EN RESINE SYNTHETIQUE | [2006/43] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2006 | Translation filed | 29.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 26.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0669255 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-8* page 7, line 16 - line 31 *; | [A]WO9962770 (PORTOLA PACKAGING INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *; | [YA]US2002148800 (OZAWA TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,7,8 * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 6; figures 7,9 * [A] 4-6; | [YA]WO02098755 (WHITE CAP INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,7,8 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021] * [A] 4-6 | International search | [A]JP2000503944 ; | [A]JP2002053117 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD); | [A]US6626324 (BOYD TIMOTHY J [US]) |