EP1719933 - POWER TRANSMISSION CHAIN AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME, AND POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUHARA, Shinji 1023-32, Shinmachi Yamatokooriyama-shi Nara 6391054 / JP | 02 /
KAMAMOTO, Shigeo 1-21-503, Tanabe 2-Chome Kashiwara-shi, Osaka 5820024 / JP | 03 /
FUKUI, Nobuki 7-5-1-105, Kokubuhonmachi, Kashiwara-shi Osaka 582-0021 / JP | 04 /
OKUMOTO, Masafumi 280-32, Tsutsui-cho Yamatokooriyama-shi Nara 6391123 / JP | 05 /
FUSE, Masaru 270-17, Yamanobo-cho Kashihara-shi, Nara 6340071 / JP | [2007/15] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
YASUHARA, Shinji 1023-32, Shinmachi Yamatokooriyama-shi Nara 6391054 / JP | ||
02 /
KAMAMOTO, Shigeo 1-21-503, Tanabe 2-Chome Kashiwara-shi, Osaka 5820024 / JP | |||
03 /
FUKUI, Nobuki 7-5-1-105, Kokubuhonmachi, Kashiwara-shi Osaka 582-0021 / JP | |||
04 /
OKUMOTO, Masfumi 280-32, Tsutsui-cho Yamatokooriyama-shi Nara 6391123 / JP | |||
05 /
FUSE, Masaru 270-17, Yamanobo-cho Kashihara-shi, Nara 6340071 / JP | |||
Former [2006/45] | 01 /
YASUHARA, Shinji 1023-32, Shinmachi Yamatokooriyama-shi Nara 6391054 / JP | ||
02 /
KAMAMOTO, Shigeo 1-21-503, Tanabe 2-Chome Kashiwara-shi, Osaka 5820024 / JP | |||
03 /
FUKUI, Nobuki 792-14, Shinmachi Yamatokooriyama-shi Nara 6391054 / JP | |||
04 /
OKUMOTO, Masanori 280-32, Tsutsui-cho Yamatokooriyama-shi Nara 6391123 / JP | |||
05 /
FUSE, Masaru 270-17, Yamanobo-cho Kashihara-shi, Nara 6340071 / JP | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | Sajda, Wolf E., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05704258.2 | 28.01.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005JP01260 | Priority number, date | JP20040024053 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004024053 | JP20040022776 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004022776 | [2006/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005073594 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1719933 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/18 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
F16G5/18 (EP,KR,US);
F16G13/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/19] |
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSKETTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2006/45] | English: | POWER TRANSMISSION CHAIN AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME, AND POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE | [2006/45] | French: | CHA NE DE TRANSMISSION ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-C I ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2006 | Translation filed | 30.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 07.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB331093 (RENOLD HANS LTD, et al) [A] 6 * page 6, line 116 - page 7, line 97; figures 1-3,10 *; | [I]DE1627712 (MASCH UND APPBAU SEUTHE GMBH) [I] 6 * figure 4 * * page 18, line 22 - page 19, line 13 *; | [X]GB2066410 (FMC CORP) [X] 1,8 * figures 9-11 * * page 2, line 81 - line 108 *; | [A]JPS62234635 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 7 * abstract ** figure 4 *; | [I]CS269891 (STERBA FRANTISEK ING [CS], et al) [I] 7 * figure - *; | [A]US5545489 (TANAKA TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 4,11 * column 2, line 3 - line 37 *; | [A]EP1122465 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 4,11 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * figure 5 * | International search | [X]JPH08193645 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]JPS633545U ; | [X]JPS6081538 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH08312725 |