EP1706824 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SHARED I/O IN A LOAD/STORE FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nextio, Inc. 12401 Research Blvd., Suite 200 Austin, TX 78729 / US | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Khan, Asif 2407 Guara Drive Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US | 02 /
PAGAN, Annette 1725 Chasewood Drive Austin, Texas 78727 / US | 03 /
PEKKALA, Richard 8702 Dorman Cove Austin, Texas 78717 / US | 04 /
PETTEY, Christopher 2307 Kristen Lane Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US | 05 /
UTLEY, Robert 3900 Simon Ridge Ct. Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
Khan, Asif 2407 Guara Drive Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US | ||
02 /
PAGAN, Annette 1725 Chasewood Drive Austin, Texas 78727 / US | |||
03 /
PEKKALA, Richard 8702 Dorman Cove Austin, Texas 78717 / US | |||
04 /
PETTEY, Christopher 2307 Kristen Lane Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US | |||
05 /
UTLEY, Robert 3710 Norman Loop Round Rock, Texas 78664 / US | |||
Former [2006/40] | 01 /
Khan, Asif 8609B Talyne Chaise Circle Austin, Texas 78729 / US | ||
02 /
PAGAN, Annette 1725 Chasewood Drive Austin, Texas 78727 / US | |||
03 /
PEKKALA, Richard 8702 Dorman Cove Austin, Texas 78717 / US | |||
04 /
PETTEY, Christopher 2307 Kristen Lane Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US | |||
05 /
UTLEY, Robert 3710 Norman Loop Round Rock, Texas 78664 / US | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | O'Connell, David Christopher HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05705027.0 | 06.01.2005 | [2006/40] | WO2005US00215 | Priority number, date | US20040757713 | 14.01.2004 Original published format: US 757713 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005071554 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1706824 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1706824 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
G06F13/4022 (EP,US);
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
G06F2213/0026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/16] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR GETEILTE E/A IN EINEM LADE-SPEICHERFELD | [2006/40] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SHARED I/O IN A LOAD/STORE FABRIC | [2006/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR ENTREE/SORTIE PARTAGEE DANS UNE MATRICE DE CHARGE/STOCKAGE | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08005900.9 / EP1950666 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0574691 (IBM [US]) [A] 27-43 * abstract * * column 18, line 10 - column 20, line 56 * * figure 5 * * column 28, line 10 - line 41 * * figure 16A *; | [A]US2003217183 (RIMMER TODD [US], et al) [A] 27-43 * abstract * * paragraph [0056] * | [AX] - GARY SOLOMON; JOE BENNETT: ADVANCED SWITCHING ARCHITECTURE, (20030917), XP002328190 [A] 1-26,44-71,75,76 * page 32 - page 54 * [X] 72-74 | [AX] - DESIGNING NETWORK ATTACHED STORAGE PLATFORM WITH ADVANCED SWITCHING, XILINX, (20030916), XP002328191 [A] 1-26,44-71,75,76 * the whole document * [X] 72-74 | [A] - ADVANCED SWITCHING EXTENDS PCI EXPRESS, XILINX, KIRAN S. PURANIK, (2003), XP002328192 [A] 1-26,44-76 * the whole document * | [A] - FABRICS AND APPLICATION CHARACTERISTICS FOR ADVANCEDTCA ARCHITECTURES, INTEL TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (20031114), XP002328193 [A] 1-26,44-76 * the whole document * | [A] - MAYHEW D ET AL, "PCI express and advanced switching: evolutionary path to building next generation interconnects", HIGH PERFORMANCE INTERCONNECTS, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. 11TH SYMPOSIUM ON 20-22 AUG 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030820), ISBN 0-7695-2012-X, pages 21 - 29, XP010657970 [A] 1-26,44-76 * the whole document * |