EP1714377 - SWITCHED NOISE FILTER CIRCUIT FOR A DC-DC CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC 5005 East McDowell Road - A700 Phoenix, Arizona 85008 / US | [2016/10] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC 5005 East McDowell Road - A700 Phoenix, Arizona 85008 / US | ||
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. One Technology Way, P.O. Box 9106 Norwood, MA 02062-9106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REDL, Richard Montevaux 14 CH-1726 Farvagny-le-Petit / CH | 02 /
LI, Yuxin 825 Kiely Boulevard, Apt. 21 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 03 /
REIZIK, Gabor 2855 Sable Oaks Way Dublin, CA 94568 / US | [2006/43] | Representative(s) | South, Nicholas Geoffrey AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | South, Nicholas Geoffrey A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | ||
Former [2013/02] | South, Nicholas Geoffrey A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2011/25] | Turner, Craig Robert, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2006/43] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 05705109.6 | 05.01.2005 | [2006/43] | WO2005US00321 | Priority number, date | US20040762650 | 21.01.2004 Original published format: US 762650 | [2006/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005074111 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1714377 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1714377 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/44, H02M3/156 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
H02M3/156 (EP,US);
H02M1/44 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/43] | H02M3/156 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/10] |
Former [2007/17] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GESCHALTETE RAUSCHFILTERSCHALTUNG FÜR EINEN GLEICHSTROM-GLEICHSTROM-WANDLER | [2006/43] | English: | SWITCHED NOISE FILTER CIRCUIT FOR A DC-DC CONVERTER | [2006/43] | French: | CIRCUIT DE FILTRE DE BRUIT COMMUTE POUR CONVERTISSEUR CC-CC | [2006/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 05.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.12.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2000312468 ; | [Y]EP1322029 (ST MICROELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-34* paragraphs [0006] , [0023] , [0024]; figures 1,2 *; | [E]WO2005015723 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [E] 1-5 * page 11, line 11 - page 12, lines 4-7 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010305), vol. 2000, no. 14, & JP2000312468 A 20001107 (SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC) [Y] 1-34 * abstract * |