EP1704480 - CLUSTER DATABASE WITH REMOTE DATA MIRRORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oracle International Corporation 500 Oracle Parkway Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDRASEKARAN, Sashikanth 4325 Renaissance Drive, Apt. 213 San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 02 /
KEHOE, William, F. 891 Kelmore Street Moss Beach, CA 94038 / US | [2007/38] |
Former [2006/49] | 01 /
CHANDRASEKARAN, Sashikanth 4325 Renaissance Drive, 213 San Jose, CA 95134 / US | ||
02 /
KEHOE, William, F. 891 Kelmore Street Moss Beach, CA 94038 / US | |||
Former [2006/39] | 01 /
CHANDRASEKARAN, Sashikanth 2545 Carlmont Drive 24 Belmont, CA 94002 / US | ||
02 /
KEHOE, William, F. 891 Kelmore Street Moss Beach, CA 94038 / US | Representative(s) | Dendorfer, Claus, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Dendorfer, Claus, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/39] | Dendorfer, Claus Wächtershäuser & Hartz Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05705624.4 | 12.01.2005 | [2006/39] | WO2005US01056 | Priority number, date | US20040760013 | 15.01.2004 Original published format: US 760013 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005071575 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1704480 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1704480 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
G06F11/2079 (EP,US);
G06F11/1425 (EP,US);
G06F11/1662 (EP,US);
G06F11/2069 (EP,US);
G06F11/2071 (EP,US);
G06F11/2094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/16] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CLUSTER-DATENBANK MIT FERNDATENSPIEGELUNG | [2006/39] | English: | CLUSTER DATABASE WITH REMOTE DATA MIRRORING | [2006/39] | French: | BASE DE DONNEES EN GRAPPE A MIROITAGE DE DONNEES A DISTANCE | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 27.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 06.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2003188114 (LUBBERS CLARK [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,10-17 * paragraphs [0004] , [0013] , [0026] , [0027] , [0031] , [0036] , [0039] * [A] 9,18; | [Y]US2002083036 (PRICE DANIEL M [US]) [Y] 1-8,10-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0012] *; | [Y]US6643795 (SICOLA STEPHEN J [US], et al) [Y] 2,11 * column 3, lines 33-55 * * column 6, line 20 - column 9, line 48 * * column 19, line 4 - column 20, line 29 *; | [Y]EP1274012 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 7,16 * paragraphs [0005] - [0020] - [0024] - [0033] *; | [Y]US6505307 (STELL JEFFREY A [US], et al) [Y] 8,17 * abstract *; | [A]US5917998 (CABRERA LUIS FELIPE [US], et al) [A] 1,3-7,10,12-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 31 - column 6, line 58 * |