EP1706149 - LIPOSOME COMPOSITION FOR DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALZA Corporation 1900 Charleston Avenue, P.O. Box 7210 Mountain View, CA 94039 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states ALZA CORPORATION 1900 Charleston Avenue, P.O. Box 7210 Mountain View, CA 94039 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZALIPSKY, Samuel 1202 Truman Street Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Weiming 731 La Playa Street C San Francisco, CA 94121 / US | 03 /
HUANG, Shi, Kun 5859 Gold Creek Drive Castro Valley, CA 94552 / US | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Williams, Paul Edwin, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | Williams, Paul Edwin, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05705796.0 | 13.01.2005 | [2006/40] | WO2005US01398 | Priority number, date | US20040513864P | 15.01.2004 Original published format: US 513864 P | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005070466 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1706149 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61K9/127 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
C07F9/09 (KR);
A61K47/544 (EP,US);
A61K47/6911 (EP,US);
A61K48/0008 (EP,US);
A61K48/0025 (EP,US);
A61K48/0041 (EP,US);
A61K9/1273 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07F9/08 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/40] | A61K47/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LIPOSOM-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ABGABE VON THERAPEUTISCHEN MITTELN | [2006/40] | English: | LIPOSOME COMPOSITION FOR DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS | [2006/40] | French: | COMPOSITION DE LIPOSOMES POUR L'ADMINISTRATION D'AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 21.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/50] | 09.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US2003031704 (HUANG SHI-KUN [US], et al) [DX] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [I]EP0784984 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [I] 1-28 * example - * * claim - *; | [I]EP1046394 (IMARX PHARMACEUTICAL CORP [US]) [I] 1-28 * example - * * claim - *; | [I]WO0159156 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [I] 1-28 * example - * * claims 1,9,10 *; | [Y]WO03070220 (NOVOSOM AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-28 * example - *; | [Y]WO02066490 (NOVOSOM AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-28 * example - * * claim - *; | [I]US2001038851 (ALLEN THERESA M [CA], et al) [I] 1-28 * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0138]; figures 5A,5B; example - *; | [Y] - VIGNERON J-P ET AL, "GUANIDINIUM-CHOLESTEROL CATIONIC LIPIDS: EFFICIENT VECTORS FOR THE TRANSFECTION OF EUKARYOTIC CELLS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (19960903), vol. 93, no. 18, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9682 - 9686, XP002030510 [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * figure - * * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.18.9682 | [Y] - COLLINS D ET AL, "STRUCTURAL AND FUNCTIONAL COMPARISONS OF PH-SENSITIVE LIPOSOMES COMPOSED OF PHOSPHATIDYLETHANOLAMINE AND THREE DIFFERENT DIACYLSUCCINYLGLYCEROLS", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1990), vol. 1025, no. 2, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 234 - 242, XP002284211 [Y] 10-28 * page 235 - page 236 * * figure - * * page 240 - page 241 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2736(90)90102-T | [X] - SUGAHARA M ET AL, "The importance of acyl chain placement on phospholipid mixing in the phisiologically relevant fluid phase", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2001), vol. 123, no. 11, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 2697 - 2698, XP002411826 [X] 1-9 * page 2697, column L, paragraph L - column R, line 2 * * scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja005811h | [PX] - MAEDA N ET AL, "Synthesis of angiogenesis-targeted peptide and hydrophobized polyethylene glycol conjugate", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20040223), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1015 - 1017, XP002411827 [PX] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2003.11.073 | [LX] - MAEDA N ET AL, "Synthesis of angiogenesis-targeted peptide and hydrophobized polyethylene glycol conjugate", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, vol. 14, no. 4, (20040114), pages 1015 - 1017, URL: doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2003.11.073, (20061214), XP002411828 [LX] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2003.11.073 |