EP1715807 - ANCHORING ELEMENT FOR USE IN BONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nobel Biocare Services AG Postfach 8058 Zürich-Flughafen / CH | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Nobel Biocare Services AG Postfach 8058 Zürich-Flughafen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANTER, Stanton, R. 19274 Berclair Lane Tarzana, CA 91356 / US | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Byström, Kurt Linus Nobel Biocare AB Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Byström, Kurt Linus Nobel Biocare AB Box 5190 S-402 26 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 05706134.3 | 28.01.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005US02717 | Priority number, date | US20040539633P | 28.01.2004 Original published format: US 539633 P | US20050035266 | 12.01.2005 Original published format: US 35266 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005072640 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1715807 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1715807 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
A61C8/0039 (EP,US);
A61C8/00 (KR);
A61C8/0018 (EP,US);
A61C8/0022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERANKERUNGSELEMENT ZUR VERWENDUNG IN KNOCHEN | [2006/44] | English: | ANCHORING ELEMENT FOR USE IN BONE | [2006/44] | French: | ELEMENT D'ANCRAGE A UTILISER DANS DE L'OS | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08005017.2 / EP1952781 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.03.2008 | CZ | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | EE | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | LT | 19.03.2008 | PL | 19.03.2008 | RO | 19.03.2008 | SI | 19.03.2008 | SK | 19.03.2008 | TR | 19.03.2008 | BG | 19.06.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | IS | 19.07.2008 | PT | 26.08.2008 | HU | 20.09.2008 | [2012/50] |
Former [2011/43] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
TR | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
GR | 20.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
GR | 20.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
GR | 20.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
LT | 19.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2001004711 (LAZZARA RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11-14 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1145691 (BIOLOK INT INC [US]) [X] 1-3,11-14* the whole document *; | [X]US2002160335 (ASHMAN ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11-14 * the whole document * |