EP1716353 - APPARATUS FOR CONVERSION OF A ROTATION MOVEMENT INTO BACK-AND-FORWARD ROTATION MOVEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Picanol N.V. Ter Waarde 50 8900 Ieper / BE | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROELSTRAETE, Kristof Lindelaan 73 B-8550 Zwevegem / BE | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/44] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05707160.7 | 03.02.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005EP01069 | Priority number, date | DE20041008448 | 16.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004008448 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005078317 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1716353 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1716353 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/04 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
F16H57/0421 (EP);
F16H57/0497 (EP);
F16H25/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMWANDLUNG EINER DREHBEWEGUNG ZU RÜCKWÄRTS- UND VORWÄRTS-DREHBEWEGUNGEN | [2006/44] | English: | APPARATUS FOR CONVERSION OF A ROTATION MOVEMENT INTO BACK-AND-FORWARD ROTATION MOVEMENTS | [2006/44] | French: | APPAREIL DE CONVERSION D'UN MOUVEMENT ROTATIF EN MOUVEMENTS ROTATIFS AVANT / ARRIERE | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 11.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.2009 | CY | 25.11.2009 | CZ | 25.11.2009 | DK | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | FI | 25.11.2009 | LT | 25.11.2009 | NL | 25.11.2009 | PL | 25.11.2009 | RO | 25.11.2009 | SE | 25.11.2009 | SI | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | TR | 25.11.2009 | IE | 03.02.2010 | LU | 03.02.2010 | BG | 25.02.2010 | GB | 25.02.2010 | GR | 26.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | FR | 01.03.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | ES | 08.03.2010 | IS | 25.03.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.02.2010 | ||
LU | 03.02.2010 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GB | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.02.2010 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GB | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.02.2010 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GB | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.02.2010 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 25.11.2009 | |
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3323382 (FRED RUSCHMANN) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XA]US3798983 (SMITH W) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * [A] 2-13; | [A]GB2283074 (NEALE MICHAEL JOHN [GB]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0665908 (INTERPATENTS LTD [IE])[DA] 1-13; | [XA]US6158720 (PATRICK PAUL DOUGLAS [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-13 * abstract * * figures 4-13 * * column 3, line 42 - line 48 * [A] 10 | by applicant | US4052906 | EP0665908 |