EP1720750 - WIPER BLADE CONNECTING ELEMENT COMPRISING A HOLLOW, OPEN-TOPPED HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2011 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage Service Propriété Industrielle 8 Rue Louis Lormand CS 90581 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES D'ESSUYAGE Z.A. de l'Agiot, Boite postale 81, 8 rue Louis Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIENARD, Jean-Claude Résidence de l'Epte Rue du Général Leclerc F-27140 Gisors / FR | [2006/46] | Application number, filing date | 05707271.2 | 09.02.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005EP01276 | Priority number, date | FR20040001496 | 13.02.2004 Original published format: FR 0401496 | [2006/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005087560 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720750 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/40 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
B60S1/4006 (EP,US);
B60S1/3849 (EP,US);
B60S1/4016 (EP,US);
B60S1/3806 (EP,US);
B60S1/3867 (EP,US);
B60S2001/3822 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN HOHLES, OBEN OFFENES GEHÄUSE UMFASSENDES WISCHERBLATTVERBINDUNGSELEMENT | [2006/46] | English: | WIPER BLADE CONNECTING ELEMENT COMPRISING A HOLLOW, OPEN-TOPPED HOUSING | [2006/46] | French: | ELEMENT DE LIAISON DE BALAI D'ESSUIE-GLACE COMPORTANT UN LOGEMENT CREUX OUVERT VERS LE HAUT | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 01.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/35] | 04.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2867473 (GIBSON FRANK M) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 57 - line 69; figure - *; | [A]CA1001844 (GREENHALGH WILLIAM) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 43 - line 44; figure - *; | [A]US5873623 (DUNTON ROY POWELL [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 13 - line 23; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0947401 (MITSUBA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 31 - line 51; figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 10 - line 31 *; | [DX]FR2830823 (VALEO SYSTEMES DESSUYAGE [FR]) [DX] 1-10,13,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003213089 (MERKEL WILFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,13,14* page 2, paragraph 31 - page 4, paragraph 38; figure - * |