EP1716069 - DISPENSING OF A SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MDS Global Holding Ltd. 189/2, The Strand Gzira GZR 03 / MT | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVERS, Lucas, Alphonsus, Maria 106, Verlengde Slotlaan NL-3707 CL Zeist / NL | 02 /
STERNGOLD, Edouard 45, Van Eycklei B-2018 Antwerpen / BE | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Houben, Christiaan Hein Willem Frans, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Houben, Christiaan Hein Willem Frans, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 05707418.9 | 11.02.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005EP01541 | Priority number, date | EP20040075524 | 18.02.2004 Original published format: EP 04075524 | EP20040076206 | 21.04.2004 Original published format: EP 04076206 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005077811 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1716069 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1716069 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/00 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
A47J31/407 (EP,US);
B67D1/00 (KR);
B65D77/38 (US);
A47J31/4482 (EP,US);
A47J31/56 (EP,US);
B65B3/022 (US);
B65B69/005 (EP,US);
B65B9/04 (KR);
B65D1/32 (EP,US);
B65D75/58 (KR);
B65D77/2064 (EP,US);
B65D81/32 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGABE EINES STOFFES | [2006/44] | English: | DISPENSING OF A SUBSTANCE | [2006/44] | French: | DISTRIBUTION D'UNE SUBSTANCE FLUIDE | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 17.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | EP08075219.9 / EP1944264 | EP09176849.9 / EP2154101 | EP10180195.9 / EP2292551 | EP10180202.3 / EP2292552 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 10.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 10.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.05.2008 | CZ | 14.05.2008 | EE | 14.05.2008 | FI | 14.05.2008 | LT | 14.05.2008 | RO | 14.05.2008 | SI | 14.05.2008 | SK | 14.05.2008 | BG | 14.08.2008 | GR | 15.08.2008 | IS | 14.09.2008 | PT | 14.10.2008 | HU | 15.11.2008 | LU | 11.02.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 14.05.2008 | |
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
LU | 11.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 14.05.2008 | |
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
LU | 11.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CZ | 14.05.2008 | |
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 14.05.2008 | |
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 14.05.2008 | |
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 14.05.2008 | |
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 14.05.2008 | |
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 14.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3874143 (BRABER ROBERT J)[A] 59; | [YA]US4220259 (LAGNEAUX JEAN [FR]) [Y] 1,2,5,7-20,22-32 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 43; figure - * [A] 66-68; | [XY]EP0310306 (REDMOND SANFORD [US]) [X] 59,62-65 * column 3, line 52 - column 9, line 44; figure - * [Y] 60,61; | [Y]EP0320262 (SANDEN CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 19,20,22 * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 46; figure - *; | [X]US4890744 (LANE JR WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 33-37 * column 3, line 48 - column 9, line 32; figure - *; | [A]US4915261 (STRENGER MARSHALL C [US]) [A] 1,3,10-16 * column 4, line 1 - column 17, line 46; figure - *; | [XY]US5215221 (DIRKSING ROBERT S [US]) [X] 33-40,42-56 * column 1, lines 28-40 * * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 45; figure - * [Y] 41,57,58,60,61; | [X]US5477660 (SMITH DONALD E [US]) [X] 59,62-65 * column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 33; figure - *; | [YA]US5842603 (SCHROEDER ALFRED A [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,7-20,22-32 * abstract * * column 6, lines 12-51; figure - * [A] 68; | [A]WO0009416 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 57,58 * page 5, line 34 - page 7, line 31; figure - *; | [A]DE19933118 (MITSCHKE HANS PETER [DE]) [A] 1,18-20,22 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 35; figure . *; | [X]US6105761 (PEUKER MARC [DE], et al) [X] 33,34,57 * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 44; figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [X]WO0107325 (REDMOND SANFORD [US]) [X] 59,62 * page 2, line 11 - page 6, line 4; figure -; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE19962436 (ESPE DENTAL AG [DE]) [Y] 57,58 * column 5, line 44 - column 8, line 34; figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO0228241 (BOYD COFFEE CO [US]) [A] 1,6,23-32 * pages 4-12; figure - *; | [X]WO02078499 (EUGSTER FRISMAG AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,5-8,10-17,23-32 * page 12, line 6 - page 19, line 11; figure - *; | [XY]DE10211593 (HUHTAMAKI RONSBERG, ZWEIGNIEDERLASSUNG DER HUHTAMAKI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH) [X] 33-37,39-46,48-56 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 54; figures 1-3 * [Y] 41; | [PX]EP1489042 (WHITLENGE DRINK EQUIPMENT LTD [GB]) [PX] 1,3,24-26,29,31 * column 8, lines 33-44 * * column 4, line 24 - column 9, line 31; figures 2a,2b,3c * |