EP1716037 - HYDRAULIC POWER ASSISTED STEERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Lenksysteme GmbH Richard-Bullinger-Strasse 77 73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOGEL, Walter Am Sonnenweg 8 73453 Abtsgmünd / DE | 02 /
HÄGELE, Michael Liebigstrasse 9 73432 Aalen / DE | 03 /
HEINTSCHEL, Manfred Graneggstrasse 13 73525 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2006/44] | Application number, filing date | 05707995.6 | 10.02.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005EP50592 | Priority number, date | DE20041007833 | 18.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004007833 | [2006/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005080178 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1716037 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1716037 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/09 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
B62D5/12 (EP,US);
B62D5/092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [2007/21] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE SERVOLENKUNG | [2006/44] | English: | HYDRAULIC POWER ASSISTED STEERING SYSTEM | [2006/44] | French: | DIRECTION ASSISTEE HYDRAULIQUE | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 19.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4130989 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 14 * * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 58; figures 1-3; claims 1-8 *; | [DA]DE19541749 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 64 ** column 3, line 18 - column 5, line 40; figures 1-3; claim - *; | [YA]GB2328191 (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [Y] 6 * page 1, line 12 - page 4, line 8; figure 1; claim - * [A] 1; | [A]EP0931714 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 7,8 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] - [0034]; figure 1; claim - *; | [Y]DE10159704 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * paragraphs [0005] - [0021] - [0027] - [0032]; figures 1-3; claim - *; | [XY]EP1375303 (ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [0015] - [0045]; figures 1,6,7; claim - * [Y] 6,9,10 | by applicant | EP0708011 | DE19541749 |