EP1716287 - METHOD AND APPARATUS IN CONJUNCTION WITH A SHOE PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaahto OY Vanha Messiläntie 6 15860 Hollola / FI | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHO, Erkki Laiduntie 12 FI-47200 Elimäki / FI | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Laine, Terho Tapio Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Ayritie 8 D 01510 Vantaa / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Laine, Terho Tapio Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D 01510 Vantaa / FI | ||
Former [2006/44] | Laine, Terho Tapio Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Annankatu 31-33 C 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 05708175.4 | 14.02.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005FI00095 | Priority number, date | FI20040000264 | 19.02.2004 Original published format: FI 20040264 | [2006/44] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005080675 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1716287 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1716287 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/06 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
D21F3/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/44] | D21F3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT EINER SCHUHPRESSE | [2006/44] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS IN CONJUNCTION WITH A SHOE PRESS | [2006/44] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL UTILISES CONJOINTEMENT A UNE PRESSE A SABOT | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.04.2007 | 29.02.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2005 | BE | 11.01.2012 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | NL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | IE | 14.02.2012 | LU | 14.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 14.02.2012 | ||
LU | 14.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 14.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 14.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4713147 (SAARINEN ESKO [FI]); | [A]WO9100389 (BELOIT CORP [US]); | [Y]WO9916967 (VALMET KARLSTAD AB [SE]); | [A]WO9916971 (VALMET KARLSTAD AB [SE]); | [A]WO0198584 (METSO PAPER INC [FI], et al); | [A]EP1375741 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | US4713147 | EP0737776 | EP0740016 | FI103591B | US5935385 | US6083352 | US6093283 |