EP1718624 - BENZAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS GLUCOKINASE ACTIVATING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2009/13] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSTONE, Craig, AstraZeneca R & D Alderley Alderley Park, Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 02 /
MCKERRECHER, Darren, AstraZeneca R & D Alderley Alderley Park, Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 03 /
PIKE, Kurt, Gordon, AstraZeneca R & D Alderley Alderley Park, Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [2006/45] | Application number, filing date | 05708360.2 | 15.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005GB00545 | Priority number, date | GB20040003593 | 18.02.2004 Original published format: GB 0403593 | GB20040013386 | 16.06.2004 Original published format: GB 0413386 | GB20040023039 | 16.10.2004 Original published format: GB 0423039 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005080359 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1718624 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1718624 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/46, C07D417/12, C07D231/40, C07D403/12, C07D487/08, A61K31/415, A61K31/426, A61K31/427, A61P3/10 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
C07D487/08 (EP,US);
C07D277/46 (EP,KR,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/10 (EP);
A61P7/12 (EP);
C07D231/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | 18.09.2006 | BA | 18.09.2006 | HR | 18.09.2006 | LV | 18.09.2006 | MK | 18.09.2006 | YU | 18.09.2006 | Title | German: | BENZAMIDDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS GLUCOKINASEAKTIVIERENDE MITTEL | [2006/45] | English: | BENZAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS GLUCOKINASE ACTIVATING AGENTS | [2006/45] | French: | DERIVES DE BENZAMIDE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'ACTIVATEURS DE LA GLUCOKINASE | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP08158356.9 / EP2048137 | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.03.2009 | BE | 25.03.2009 | CY | 25.03.2009 | CZ | 25.03.2009 | DK | 25.03.2009 | EE | 25.03.2009 | FI | 25.03.2009 | LT | 25.03.2009 | PL | 25.03.2009 | RO | 25.03.2009 | SI | 25.03.2009 | SK | 25.03.2009 | BG | 25.06.2009 | GR | 26.06.2009 | IS | 25.07.2009 | PT | 01.09.2009 | HU | 26.09.2009 | [2012/42] |
Former [2012/37] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CY | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO03000267 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [DY] 1-17 * page 1 - page 2; example -; claim - *; | [DY]WO03015774 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [DY] 1-17 * page 1 - page 2; example -; claim - *; | [PY]WO2004076420 (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [PY] 1-17* example - * |