EP1730982 - DELIVERING SERVICES IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARJELUND, Pekka Kattajantie 6 FI-08680 Muijala / FI | 02 /
PEKONEN, Johanna Pihkapolku 3 D FIN-02110 Espoo / FI | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05708799.1 | 24.03.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005IB00831 | Priority number, date | GB20040007140 | 30.03.2004 Original published format: GB 0407140 | [2006/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005096655 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1730982 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1730982 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W28/18 (EP,US);
H04W4/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/20 (EP);
H04W74/00 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/50] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABLIEFERN VON DIENSTEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2006/50] | English: | DELIVERING SERVICES IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2006/50] | French: | PRESTATION DE SERVICES DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.05.2009 | BE | 27.05.2009 | CY | 27.05.2009 | CZ | 27.05.2009 | DK | 27.05.2009 | EE | 27.05.2009 | FI | 27.05.2009 | IT | 27.05.2009 | LT | 27.05.2009 | NL | 27.05.2009 | PL | 27.05.2009 | RO | 27.05.2009 | SI | 27.05.2009 | SK | 27.05.2009 | TR | 27.05.2009 | BG | 27.08.2009 | SE | 27.08.2009 | GR | 28.08.2009 | ES | 07.09.2009 | IS | 27.09.2009 | PT | 27.09.2009 | HU | 28.11.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CY | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
HU | 28.11.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CY | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | LT | 27.05.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0103461 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 25 * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 18 * * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 7 * * page 10, line 1 - page 15, line 3 * * claims 1-12 * * figures 3-6 *; | [X]WO0111910 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 2, lines 18-36 * * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 21 * * page 18, line 430 *; | [A]US6374112 (WIDEGREN INA [SE], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 49 * * column 6, line 51 - column 12, line 45 * * column 16, lines 30-41 ** figure 1 *; | [X]US6668175 (ALMGREN MAGNUS [SE], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 1, lines 9-13 * * column 4, lines 36-47 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 65 * * column 9, line 31 - column 14, line 47 * * claim 21 *; | [X] - NAIM G ET AL, "Enhancements to QoS management for real time radio bearers in 3G cellular systems", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERNCE, 2000. WCNC. 2000 IEEE 23-28 SEPTEMBER 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000923), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-6596-8, pages 1547 - 1551, XP010532780 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0103461 | US6668175 |